This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2021 at 08:30:32 (UTC).

Intelligent Assembly, LLC v. Ingersoll-Rand Company

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Intelligent Assembly, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ingersoll-Rand Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00516

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Intelligent Assembly, LLC

Defendants

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorney

Kurt Douglas Weaver

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

9 #1

Exhibit A-US6553321

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

#6

5 #1

Certified Mail Receipt Return

5 #5

Main Document

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A-US6553321

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. on 9/16/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. (kh) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Intelligent Assembly, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Intelligent Assembly, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6553321, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotation Order: This civil case is before the Court on the parties' joint motion (Doc. #8 ) to extend time to respond to the complaint. Per Local Rule 6.1, stipulated extensions to respond to a complaint extending the time for no more than 21 days, "can be done only by filing with the Clerk a written stipulation between the parties." The Court will construe the stipulated motion as a stipulation filed with the Clerk and GRANT the motion. (Doc. #8 ). Defendant now has until 10/07/2021 to respond to the complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/13/2021. (rrs) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 10/7/2021. by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Weaver, Kurt) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Douglas Weaver for Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Weaver, Kurt) (Entered: 09/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. Ingersoll-Rand Company served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (bjc) Modified File Date on 9/1/2021 (bjc). (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ingersoll-Rand Company. (kh) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Intelligent Assembly, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ingersoll-Rand Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8446621), filed by Intelligent Assembly, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US6553321, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGERSOLL-RAND INDUSTRIAL U.S., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ingersoll Rand Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KURT DOUGLAS WEAVER