This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 07:12:17 (UTC).

Intellectual Property Development, Inc. v. Boise Cascade Engineered Wood Products et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Intellectual Property Development, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Boise Cascade Engineered Wood Products. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10228

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Intellectual Property Development, Inc.

Defendants, Counter Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Claimants

Warren Trask Company, Inc.

Evanston Insurance Company

One Supplier of Adhesives and One Supplier of Liners

Boise Cascade Engineered Wood Products

National Lumbar Company

One Unnamed Gluing Machine Manufacturer

Limited Liability Delaware Corporation

Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC

Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,

Counter Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Claimants

Glenn Robell

National Lumbar Company

ntellectual Property Development, Inc.,

Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,

Intellectual Property Development, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant

Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant, Counter Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald J. Hubbard

46 Stratford Street

Boston, MA 02132

Mark E. Barnett

Attorney at National Lumber Company

71 Maple Street, P.O. Box 32

Mansfield, MA 02048

Kirk C. Teska

Attorney at Iandiorio & Teska

255 Bear Hill Road

Waltham, MA 02451

Joseph A. Seckler

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

446 Main Street, Suite 1010

Worcester, MA 01608

Klaus H. Hamm

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman LLP

One World Trade Center, 121 Sw Salmon Street, Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

David Viens

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210

Counter Defendant, Defendant, 3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mark E. Barnett

Attorney at National Lumber Company

71 Maple Street, P.O. Box 32

Mansfield, MA 02048

Kirk C. Teska

Attorney at Iandiorio & Teska

255 Bear Hill Road

Waltham, MA 02451

Joseph A. Seckler

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

446 Main Street, Suite 1010

Worcester, MA 01608

Klaus H. Hamm

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman LLP

One World Trade Center, 121 Sw Salmon Street, Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

20 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E to the Brief

20 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D to the Brief

20 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C to the Brief

20 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to the Brief

20 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to the Brief

#20

(#20) Memorandum in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Brief) by National Lumbar Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Brief)(Teska, Kirk) Modified on 3/26/2019 to correct event used (Lima, Christine). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by National Lumbar Company.(Teska, Kirk) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Boise Cascade's counterclaims by Glenn Robell.(Hubbard, Donald) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/18/2019) to upload document with corrected header (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

17 #1

Exhiibits

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Pre-Applied Systems, Inc. against National Lumbar Company, COUNTERCLAIM by Glenn Robell and Intellectual Property Development, Inc. against National Lumbar Company by Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhiibits, #2 Exhibits)(Hubbard, Donald) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Klaus H. Hamm Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7526835 . (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#8

(#10) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Klaus H. Hamm. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Viens, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/5/2019) to flatten out file (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#3) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Memorandum in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Brief) by National Lumbar Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Brief)(Teska, Kirk) Modified on 3/26/2019 to correct event used (Lima, Christine). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by National Lumbar Company.(Teska, Kirk) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Boise Cascade's counterclaims by Glenn Robell.(Hubbard, Donald) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/18/2019) to upload document with corrected header (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Pre-Applied Systems, Inc. against National Lumbar Company, COUNTERCLAIM by Glenn Robell and Intellectual Property Development, Inc. against National Lumbar Company by Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhiibits, #2 Exhibits)(Hubbard, Donald) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim and Waiving Service by Boise Cascade Engineered Wood Products, Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC, Intellectual Property Development, Inc.(A California Corporation), Intellectual Property Development, Inc., Intellectual Property Development, Inc.,, Glenn Robell. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Intellectual Property Development, Inc.. (Hubbard, Donald) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Barnett on behalf of National Lumbar Company (Barnett, Mark) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Intellectual Property Development, Inc. by National Lumbar Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Teska, Kirk) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATE COURT Record. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Seckler on behalf of Boise Cascade Engineered Wood Products, Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC (Seckler, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Klaus H. Hamm. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Klaus H. Hamm Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7526835 . (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Klaus H. Hamm Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7526835 by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC.(Viens, David) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • (#7) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Viens, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/5/2019) to flatten out file (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC. (Viens, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boise Cascade Wood Products, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7524069 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Viens, David) Modified on 2/5/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOISE CASCADE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Evanston Insurance Company is a litigant