This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2021 at 07:03:19 (UTC).

Integon Preferred Insurance Company v. David W. Rogers et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Integon Preferred Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against David W Rogers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01173

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integon Preferred Insurance Company

Defendants

David W. Rogers

Patricia Rogers

Greg Cabral

Daniella Cabral

MC

AC

CC

California Automobile Insurance Company

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

M. C.

A. C.

C. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick M Howe

Attorney at Patrick Howe Law APC

402 West Broadway Suite 1025

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Darren Michael Harris

Attorney at Harris Grombchevsky LLP

2070 Business Center Drive Suite 285

Irvine, CA 92612

Michael J Fairchild

Attorney at Vanderpool Law Firm

330 Main Street Sutie 203B

Seal Beach, CA 90740

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Fairchild on behalf of Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral (Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#54

(#54) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral, identifying GREG CABRAL; DANIELLA CABRAL; MC through her guardian at litem; RICHARD CABRAL; CC through her guardian ad litem. (Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#53

(#53) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral.(Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party C. C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party M. C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party Daniella Cabral(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party Greg Cabral(pty:dft))(Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#52

(#52) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #51 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#51

(#51) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants David W. Rogers, Patricia Rogers.(Attorney Darren Michael Harris added to party David W. Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney Darren Michael Harris added to party Patricia Rogers(pty:dft))(Harris, Darren) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#50

(#50) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant Daniella Cabral acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#49

(#49) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant Greg Cabral acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#48

(#48) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant M. C. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#47

(#47) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant A. C. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Fairchild on behalf of Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral (Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral, identifying GREG CABRAL; DANIELLA CABRAL; MC through her guardian at litem; RICHARD CABRAL; CC through her guardian ad litem. (Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants C. C., M. C., Daniella Cabral, Greg Cabral.(Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party C. C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party M. C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party Daniella Cabral(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Fairchild added to party Greg Cabral(pty:dft))(Fairchild, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #51 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants David W. Rogers, Patricia Rogers.(Attorney Darren Michael Harris added to party David W. Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney Darren Michael Harris added to party Patricia Rogers(pty:dft))(Harris, Darren) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant Daniella Cabral acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant Greg Cabral acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant M. C. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant A. C. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company, upon Defendant C. C. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Vanderpool, Attorney. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31591725 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Integon Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Patrick M Howe added to party Integon Preferred Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Howe, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEGON PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant