This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:39:00 (UTC).

Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Transport Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transport Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01532

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Defendants

Transport Insurance Company

R&Q Reinsurance Company

INA Reinsurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Ann Rosencrans

William M. Sneed

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #2

Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District

13 #1

Standing Order

#13

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 5/20/2019) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Exhibits A through F to re #1 Complaint for Breach of Contract and Declaratory Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against Transport Insurance Company, R&Q Reinsurance Company filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.. (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 4/8/2019) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Transport Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to R&Q Reinsurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property and Casualty U.S., Inc., a Delaware Corp. for Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property and Casualty U.S., Inc., a Delaware Corp., Corporate Parent AIG Property and Casualty Inc., a Delaware Corp. for Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Declaratory Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against Transport Insurance Company, R&Q Reinsurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13198901.). Filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rosencrans, Kelly) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less