This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL v. Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Olympus Latin Amercia Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24558

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL

Defendant

Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew John Valcourt

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 1400

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Valerie Marie Toth

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis and Bockius, LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 5300

Miami, FL 33131

Alison Tanchyk

Attorney at Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP

200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Suite 5300

Miami, FL 33131-2339

Eric Kraeutler

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert Mark Brochin

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 5300 First Union Financial Center

Miami, FL 33131-2339

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Eric Kraeutler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 12/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (rr00) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to #1 Complaint due 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 12/3/2020. (rr00) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric Kraeutler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13971374 by Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. Responses due by 12/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanchyk, Alison) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Tanchyk on behalf of Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. Attorney Alison Tanchyk added to party Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.(pty:dft). (Tanchyk, Alison) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Mark Brochin on behalf of Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. Attorney Robert Mark Brochin added to party Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.(pty:dft). (Brochin, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toth, Valerie) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Marie Toth on behalf of Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. Attorney Valerie Marie Toth added to party Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.(pty:dft). (Toth, Valerie) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. (pcs) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Olympus Latin Amercia Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13818005, filed by INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew John Valcourt