This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2020 at 08:46:34 (UTC).

Instituto Mexicano del Seguro Social v. Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Instituto Mexicano del Seguro Social filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Fresenius Medical Care AG Co KGaA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11927

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL

Defendants

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO. KGaA.

Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Valcourt

Attorney at Valcourt and Associates LLC

850 Ne Third St, Suite 208

Dania, FL 33004

Defendant Attorneys

Maria R. Durant

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

125 High Street, Suite 2010

Boston, MA 02110

William H. Kettlewell

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

125 High Street, Suite 2010

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: ALLOWING #7 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to January 15, 2021 to File A Responsive Pleading. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 15, 2021 to File A Responsive Pleading by FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC..(Durant, Maria) Modified on 11/25/2020: Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Kettlewell on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. (Kettlewell, William) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO. KGaA., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 0101-8481003 for #1 Complaint (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO. KGaA., filed by INSTITUTO MEXICANO DEL SEGURO SOCIAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE AG & CO. KGaA. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew John Valcourt