This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2019 at 07:02:31 (UTC).

InstaResponse, LLC v Moodle USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2019 InstaResponse, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Moodle USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01879

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

InstaResponse, LLC

Defendant

Moodle USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by InstaResponse, LLC as to Moodle USA, LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to November 29, 2019 - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InstaResponse, LLC. Moodle USA, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,349,299 B1. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Moodle USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2748191) - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • CASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by InstaResponse, LLC as to Moodle USA, LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for InstaResponse, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by InstaResponse, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to November 29, 2019 filed by InstaResponse, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/16/19. (ntl) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to November 29, 2019 - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InstaResponse, LLC. Moodle USA, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01878-LPS, 1:19-cv-01879-LPS, 1:19-cv-01880-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Moodle USA, LLC on 10/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,349,299 B1. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Moodle USA, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2748191) - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where InstaResponse, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow