This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2019 at 07:02:28 (UTC).

InstaResponse, LLC v. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2019 InstaResponse, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01878

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

InstaResponse, LLC

Defendant

Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Howard L. Wernow

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Neil J. McNabnay

Ricardo J. Bonilla

Noel F. Chakkalakal

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint to January 2, 2020 - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla and Noel F. Chakkalakal - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InstaResponse, LLC. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,349,299 B1. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2748190) - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint to January 2, 2020 filed by InstaResponse, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/3/19. (ntl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint to January 2, 2020 - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Noel F. Chakkalakal for Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ricardo J. Bonilla for Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Neil J. McNabnay for Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla and Noel F. Chakkalakal filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/19. (ntl) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla and Noel F. Chakkalakal - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to December 2, 2019 filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/30/19. (ntl) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to December 2, 2019 - filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for InstaResponse, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by InstaResponse, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/2019. (etg) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InstaResponse, LLC. Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01878-LPS, 1:19-cv-01879-LPS, 1:19-cv-01880-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. on 10/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,349,299 B1. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2748190) - filed by InstaResponse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where InstaResponse, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow