This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 22:07:12 (UTC).

Insta Properties, LLC v. United States Liability Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Insta Properties, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Liability Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03987

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insta Properties, LLC

Defendants

United States Liability Insurance Company

Does 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sassoon Sales

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Yu Sacro

John E Walker

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Request for Judicial Notice

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company identifying U.S. Investment Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company, identifying U.S. Investment Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03987 MEMF(ASx). (rn) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Walker, John) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On September 23, 2022, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement #11 notifying the Court that the parties have reached a resolution in this matter. The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated, (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement within 60 days of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. The Scheduling Conference set for October 6, 2022, is vacated by the Court. (yl) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On September 23, 2022, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement #11 notifying the Court that the parties have reached a resolution in this matter. The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated, (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement within 60 days of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. The Scheduling Conference set for October 6, 2022, is vacated by the Court. (yl) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Walker, John) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03987 MEMF(ASx). (rn) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.[FILED IN STATE COURT 06/08/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO.1 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, United States Liability Insurance Company.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Insta Properties, LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/03/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company, identifying U.S. Investment Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company identifying U.S. Investment Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV07879 Receipt No: ACACDC-33451193 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney John E Walker added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Walker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less