This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:37:03 (UTC).

INNIS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 INNIS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02398

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROL INNIS

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIIL

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM LEE CLARK

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

11161 East State Road 70, Suite 110-168

Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIIL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANT, PERSONAL PRODUCTS COUNCIL by CAROL INNIS (CLARK, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANT, PERSONAL PRODUCTS COUNCIL by CAROL INNIS (CLARK, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 4/26/2022, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIIL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIIL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13364312) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CAROL INNIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLARK, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Lee Clark