This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 06:03:24 (UTC).

Inman et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Inman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03737

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexis Inman

Daniel Windley

Defendants

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristina Anderson

Attorney at Hensley Legal Group, PC

8350 Sunlight Drive, Ste 300

Fishers, IN 46037

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

summons 2

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC served on 6/29/2022. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY served on 6/29/2022. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Transmittal Letter

#8

(#8) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, MDL 3602, per CTO 11 on 7/18/2022. (CKM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/20/2022) (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

9 #9

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

9 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00086 (nsf,) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, MDL 3602, per CTO 11 on 7/18/2022. (CKM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/20/2022) (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ET AL. and PRETERM INFANT NUTRITION PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No.3602 Per Certified Transfer Order #11 on 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (CKM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY served on 6/29/2022. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC served on 6/29/2022. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC, MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 summons 2)(AAS) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Anderson on behalf of Plaintiffs Alexis Inman, Daniel Windley. (Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Deman against All Defendants, filed by Alexis Inman, Daniel Windley. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7157917) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Anderson, Kristina) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 7/25/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina Anderson