This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 08:52:31 (UTC).

Inline Physical Therapy, LLC v. TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Inline Physical Therapy, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00957

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inline Physical Therapy, LLC

Defendant

TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher A. Koester

Attorney at Taylor Law Offices, P.C.

122 East Washington Avenue, P.O. Box 668

Effingham, IL 62401

Kristen M Flood

Attorney at Taylor Law Offices PC

122 East Washington Avenue, P. O. Box 668

Effingham, IL 62401

Defendant Attorneys

Alexia R. Brancato

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - New York

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jordan M. Heinz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Craig S. Primis

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#25

23 #1

Joint Report of Parties

#23

#20

#18

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B- Notice of Service of Process

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in via zoom before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Counsel will receive the appropriate Zoom video conferencing invitation via email from the Court and are instructed to provide the Zoom link to all pertinent parties to this settlement conference. Settlement statements due on or before 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 11/10/2020. (cds) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: The Court commits this matter to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference, consistent with the Federal Magistrate Act, as amended, 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 11/9/2020. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 6/7/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 11/9/2020. Attorney Kristen Flood for Plaintiff and Attorneys Alexia Brancato and Jordan Heinz for Defendant. The Joint Report of Parties is approved and will be entered. Status Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. Settlement Conference to be set before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) filed by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 11/30/2020. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/20/2020. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CJRA TRACK B assigned. Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. The parties are to submit a Joint Report of Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order using the form provided in the Local Rules, seven (7) days before the conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. (jlm) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) filed by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/16/2020. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Koester, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Craig S. Primis $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4287149 by on behalf of TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Primis, Craig) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexia R. Brancato $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4287141 by on behalf of TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Brancato, Alexia) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M Flood on behalf of Inline Physical Therapy, LLC (Flood, Kristen) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Koester on behalf of Inline Physical Therapy, LLC (Koester, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-957-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 10/13/2020 (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cognizant Technology Solutions Corporation for TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Heinz on behalf of TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Effingham Co. Circuit Court, 4th Judicial Circuit, case number 2020L30 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4284787), filed by TriZetto Provider Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Service of Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Koester