This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 07:26:26 (UTC).

Inland Empire Waterkeeper et al v. CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Inland Empire Waterkeeper filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Orange County Coastkeeper

Inland Empire Waterkeeper

Defendants

CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc.

Gerdau Reinforcing Steel

Commercial Metals Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren D Chase

Attorney at Orange County Coastkeeper

3151 Airway Avenue Suite F110

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Sarah J Spinuzzi

Attorney at Orange County Coastkeeper

3151 Airway Avenue Suite F-110

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Margaret Rosegay. (Spinuzzi, Sarah) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 05/03/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 04/26/2021 (kdu) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Reinforcing Steel. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Margaret Rosegay. (Spinuzzi, Sarah) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 05/03/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 04/26/2021 (kdu) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., Commercial Metals Company, Gerdau Reinforcing Steel. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30407320 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Inland Empire Waterkeeper, Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lauren D Chase added to party Inland Empire Waterkeeper(pty:pla), Attorney Lauren D Chase added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Chase, Lauren) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY COASTKEEPER is a litigant

Latest cases where CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMERCIAL METALS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah J Spinuzzi