This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:09:48 (UTC).

INGRAO v. MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 INGRAO filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against MAQUARIE HOLDINGS USA , INC WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Cox Arleo and Jose R. Almonte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judge

Jose R. Almonte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAAC PEDRINI INGRAO

Defendants

MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN

JOHN DOE (1-100)

XYZ CORP. (1-100)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY M HALKOVICH

Attorney at Halkovich Law, LLC

266 Harristown Road, Ste 302

Glen Rock, NJ 07452

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

766 Shrewsbury Avenue

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

POOJA BHUTANI

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

766 Shrewsbury Avenue, Suite 101

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, JOHN DOE (1-100), XYZ CORP. (1-100) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number 47687), filed by ISAAC PEDRINI INGRAO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ISAAC PEDRINI INGRAO. MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN waiver sent on 2/8/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (HALKOVICH, JEFFREY) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA BHUTANI on behalf of MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN (BHUTANI, POOJA) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL on behalf of MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL on behalf of MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA BHUTANI on behalf of MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN (BHUTANI, POOJA) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ISAAC PEDRINI INGRAO. MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN waiver sent on 2/8/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (HALKOVICH, JEFFREY) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MAQUARIE HOLDINGS (USA), INC. WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, JOHN DOE (1-100), XYZ CORP. (1-100) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number 47687), filed by ISAAC PEDRINI INGRAO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less