This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2019 at 09:15:14 (UTC).

INGRAM v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 INGRAM filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan D. Wigenton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-19525

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAWUD H. INGRAM

Fairton, NJ 08320

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

THOMAS S. KEARNEY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, 5Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM. (dam, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM (lag, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER administratively terminating this case, etc. Blank 2255 form sent, etc. (N/M). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/5/19. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. KEARNEY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (KEARNEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM (lag, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM. (dam, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER administratively terminating this case, etc. Blank 2255 form sent, etc. (N/M). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/5/19. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. KEARNEY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (KEARNEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Exhibit (Criminal transcript) to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), by DAWUD H. INGRAM. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 2:17-cr-502, filed by DAWUD H. INGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Criminal Case Sentence refiled separately, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(lag, ) Modified on 11/5/2019 (lag, ). (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.