This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 08:22:42 (UTC).

Ingram v. King County Superior Court et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Ingram filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against King County Superior Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Zilly and Mary Alice Theiler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01981

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

Referral Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Scott Ingram

Walla Walla, WA 99362-8817

Respondents

State of Washington

King County Superior Court

Donald R Holbrook

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AMENDED 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Respondent added: Donald Holbrook)**36 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #1

PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

7 #1

Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus

4 #2

Exhibit

#3

(#3) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 1/6/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 2254 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #3

Prison Trust Account

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**36 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

2254 IFP Form

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE PETITION AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. The amended petition should be filed on the forms provided by the clerk. Petitioner must correct the noted deficiencies within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**32 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Respondent added: Donald Holbrook)**36 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE PETITION AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. The amended petition should be filed on the forms provided by the clerk. Petitioner must correct the noted deficiencies within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**32 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 1/6/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 2254 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**36 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(ST) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.