This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:42:28 (UTC).

Informative Technology Systems, LLC v. NextLabs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Informative Technology Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NextLabs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-08505

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Informative Technology Systems, LLC

Defendant

NextLabs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Robert Allan McFarlane

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Standing Order

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/22/2021. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant NextLab, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by NextLabs, Inc.. (McFarlane, Robert) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. NextLabs, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to NextLabs, Inc. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Informative Technology Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Informative Technology Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASEMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/22/2021. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant NextLab, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by NextLabs, Inc.. (McFarlane, Robert) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. NextLabs, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to NextLabs, Inc. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Informative Technology Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Informative Technology Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against NextLabs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16580550.). Filed byInformative Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Informative Technology Systems is a litigant

Latest cases where NEXTLABS, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A McFarlane