This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:58:01 (UTC).

Informative Technology Systems, LLC v. CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Informative Technology Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CodeLathe Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01117

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Informative Technology Systems, LLC

Defendant

CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenuesuite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

D. Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenuesuite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

William E. Davis, III

Attorney at The Davis Firm, PC

213 N. Fredonia Street, Suite 230

Longview, TX 75601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15387417), filed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. CodeLathe Technologies, Inc. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Informative Technology Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney William E. Davis, III added to party CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) by CodeLathe Technologies, Inc..(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) STATUS REPORT CASE READINESS STATUS REPORT by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS REPORT CASE READINESS STATUS REPORT by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney William E. Davis, III added to party CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) by CodeLathe Technologies, Inc..(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: CodeLathe Technologies, Inc. answer due 12/10/2021. (ir) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Informative Technology Systems, LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. CodeLathe Technologies, Inc. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CodeLathe Technologies, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15387417), filed by Informative Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Informative Technology Systems is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Ellsworth Davis, III