This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 09:25:31 (UTC).

Infogroup Inc. v. Office Depot, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Infogroup Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Office Depot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Infogroup Inc.

Defendant

Office Depot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Luebbert

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Gregory C. Scaglione

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Defendant Attorneys

Kamron T.M. Hasan

Attorney at HUSCH, BLACKWELL LAW FIRM - OMAHA

13330 California Street, Suite 200

Omaha, NE 68154

Marnie A. Jensen

Attorney at HUSCH, BLACKWELL LAW FIRM - OMAHA

13330 California Street, Suite 200

Omaha, NE 68154

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Infogroup Parent Holdings, Inc. for Infogroup Inc.. by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Plaintiffs Infogroup Inc., Infogroup Parent Holdings, Inc..(Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Office Depot, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Requested as to Office Depot, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing filed on 3/24/2020 of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 . ) (LRM) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C - 2019 Copyright Registration

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - 2018 Copyright Registration

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - 2017 Copyright Registration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Office Depot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4135870), by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Infogroup Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2017 Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2018 Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2019 Copyright Registration)(Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting, in part, #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant' answer or response shall be filed on or before June 8, 2020. However, if the defendant needs additional time beyond June 8, 2020 due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers and set a conference to discuss a reasonable answer or response deadline under the circumstances. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Infogroup Parent Holdings, Inc. for Infogroup Inc.. by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Plaintiffs Infogroup Inc., Infogroup Parent Holdings, Inc..(Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Office Depot, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested as to Office Depot, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing filed on 3/24/2020 of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 . ) (LRM) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Infogroup Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Office Depot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4135870), by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Infogroup Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2017 Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2018 Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2019 Copyright Registration)(Luebbert, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less