This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 11:05:51 (UTC).

Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc. et al v. Tilray, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Tilray, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05263

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph M. Vazquez, III

Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.

Trimax Corporation

Defendants

Left Coast Ventures, Inc.

Tilray, Inc.

Equitable Transitions Inc

Privateer Holdings, Inc.

Privateer Evolution LLC

Hugo Saavedra

William Downes

Brett Cummings

EKO Holdings LLC

Debra Saavedra

Privateer Evolution, LLC

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Barry S Glaser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Juan A Torres

Pedro A. Gonzalez

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Michael Geher

Lauren B Rainwater

Nicole Phillis

John A. Goldmark

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Barry S Glaser

 

Court Documents

#131

#129

#127

#126

121 #2

Proposed Order

121 #1

Declaration

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - Trimax SOS

1 #6

Exhibit F - Left Coast SOS

1 #5

Exhibit E - EKO SOS

1 #4

Exhibit D - Privateer SOS

1 #3

Exhibit C - Saavedra Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Filings

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

220 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $468.10 in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III #128 (kr) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against defendant Hugo Saavedra re: Default Judgment, #127 , filed by Plaintiffs Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III, Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process Server Invoice & State Court Filing Fees) (Gonzalez, Pedro) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has been informed that defendant Hugo Saavedra appeared at the Courthouse on Monday, February 22, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. for a previously scheduled hearing on a Motion for Default Judgment filed against Mr. Saavedra. The Motion for Default Judgment was decided on the papers on February 17, 2021, and the hearing was taken off of the Court's calendar. (See Dkt. Nos. 126, 127 attached). Should Mr. Saavedra wish to have his default set aside, he may consider filing a Motion to Set Aside Default. The Los Angeles County Bar Association Lawyer Referral and Information Services may be able to refer you to a lawyer who may or may not be willing to take your case. The lawyer referral service may be reached at (213) 243-1525. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc., Trimax Corporation, Joseph M. Vazquez, III filed by defendants Privateer Evolution, LLC, Privateer Evolution LLC, Tilray, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Goldmark, John) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, in the principal amount of $93,392.00, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $93,392.00. Related to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Hugo Saavedra, Debra Saavedra, and Equitable Transitions, Inc. #125 . (See document for details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #125 MOTION for Default Judgment. For the reasons stated above, the Court grants in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. The Court awards Plaintiffs $93,320.00 in damages as against defendant Hugo Saavedra. Any additional damages requested in Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment are denied. Any motion for attorney fees and costs filed by Plaintiffs must comply with Local Rule 54 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendants Hugo Saavedra, Debra Saavedra, and Equitable Transitions, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment) (Gonzalez, Pedro) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#124) TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court, on its own motion, VACATES the Final Pretrial Conference set for January 15, 2021 and the Jury Trial set for February 16, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #93 for Summary Judgment; and #121 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Moving Defendants are entitled to summary judgment as to all of Plaintiffs' claims. The Court orders Plaintiffs to file a motion for default judgment against the Non-Moving Defendants within 14 days of the date of this Order. The failure to file a Motion for Default Judgment by this date will result in the dismissal of this action against the Non-Moving Defendants. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Documents (Dkt. No. 121) is denied as moot. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Infinity Global Consulting Group, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Pedro) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Goldmark. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12211243 by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc.. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice - John Goldmark)(Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Privateer Holdings, Inc. (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Tilray, Inc. (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Of Removal To Us District Court (Federal Court)) (Toth, Brian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Freddy Funes on behalf of Privateer Holdings, Inc., Tilray, Inc. (Funes, Freddy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers to the Complaint within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12203540, filed by Tilray, Inc., Privateer Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Saavedra Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Privateer SOS, #5 Exhibit E - EKO SOS, #6 Exhibit F - Left Coast SOS, #7 Exhibit G - Trimax SOS, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toth, Brian) Text Modified on 12/6/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.[Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/15/2020.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equitable Transitions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Trimax Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Left Coast Ventures, Inc. is a litigant