This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 04:56:39 (UTC).

Incredible Features, Inc. v. Tattoodo, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Incredible Features, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tattoodo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02458

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Incredible Features, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 5

Tattoodo, Inc.

Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce William Bellingham

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C. (PA)

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David B. Picker

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C. (PA)

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

Marc Schuyler Reiner

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Amburgey LLP

8 West 40Th St., 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program for mediation to occur by August 2, 2019. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/2019) (gr) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#14

(#14) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on June 14, 2019, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case.....This case will be referred to mediation. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties when a mediator has been selected, and the parties are directed to schedule mediation to occur by August 2, 2019. All fact discovery must be completed by December 20, 2019. The following motion will be served by the dates indicated below. Any motion for summary judgment: -Motion served by January 22, 2020-Opposition served by February 12-Reply served by February 26......In the event no motion is filed, the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by January 22, 2020....... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/2019) (gr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tattoodo, Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#12

(#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tattoodo ApS for Tattoodo, Inc.. Document filed by Tattoodo, Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David B. Picker on behalf of Incredible Features, Inc.. (Picker, David) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/25/2019) (gr) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tattoodo, Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tattoodo, Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 7/29/19, 10 AM at 40 Foley Square.(ah) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/22/2019.(ah) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program for mediation to occur by August 2, 2019. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/2019) (gr) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on June 14, 2019, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case.....This case will be referred to mediation. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties when a mediator has been selected, and the parties are directed to schedule mediation to occur by August 2, 2019. All fact discovery must be completed by December 20, 2019. The following motion will be served by the dates indicated below. Any motion for summary judgment: -Motion served by January 22, 2020-Opposition served by February 12-Reply served by February 26......In the event no motion is filed, the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by January 22, 2020....... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/19/2019) (gr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2019. (gr) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tattoodo, Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tattoodo ApS for Tattoodo, Inc.. Document filed by Tattoodo, Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David B. Picker on behalf of Incredible Features, Inc.. (Picker, David) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/25/2019) (gr) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tattoodo, Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce William Bellingham to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (The PDF is not Signed) (lb) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bruce William Bellingham to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name error in "TO" field; Caption must directly correspond with pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tattoodo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Incredible Features, Inc.. (Bellingham, Bruce) Modified on 3/20/2019 (sj). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Incredible Features, Inc..(Bellingham, Bruce) Modified on 3/20/2019 (lb). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DOES, Tattoodo, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16525791)Document filed by Incredible Features, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bellingham, Bruce) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Incredible Feature Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Schuyler Reiner