This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 10:32:29 (UTC).

IncredibleBank v. Bloomquist (TV1)

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 IncredibleBank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bloomquist TV1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia R Wyrick and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Incredible Bank

IncredibleBank

Defendants

Scott Bloomquist

Scott D Bloomquist

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith C Dennen

Attorney at Farris Bobango, PLC

414 Union Street, Suite 1105

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth J McGuire, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Kenneth J. McGuire

710 Brunswick Road

Troy, NY 12180

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Defendant filed a Motion for admission of Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr., Esq. pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 8] evidencing Mr. McGuire's Certificate of Good Standing in the Northern District of New York. Accordingly, The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as an E-Filer in this district. The registration instructions can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic CaseFiling.". Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 4/22/2021. (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

9 #1

Other Envelope

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott D Bloomquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

8 #2

Other Envelope

8 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing for Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr.

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr. (Filing fee $ 90 - PAID. Receipt #G2013055) by Scott D Bloomquist. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr., #2 Envelope). (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

7 #2

Other Request for Entry of Default

7 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Scott D Bloomquist by IncredibleBank. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Other Request for Entry of Default)(Dennen, Keith) Documents replaced to put in correct order on 4/19/2021 by JCK (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IncredibleBank. Scott D Bloomquist served on 3/19/2021. (Dennen, Keith) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Scott D Bloomquist. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Defendant filed a Motion for admission of Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr., Esq. pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 8] evidencing Mr. McGuire's Certificate of Good Standing in the Northern District of New York. Accordingly, The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as an E-Filer in this district. The registration instructions can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic CaseFiling.". Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 4/22/2021. (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott D Bloomquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 - PAID. Receipt #G2013055) filed by Scott D Bloomquist . (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr. (Filing fee $ 90 - PAID. Receipt #G2013055) by Scott D Bloomquist. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr., #2 Envelope). (LCK) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Scott D Bloomquist by IncredibleBank. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Other Request for Entry of Default)(Dennen, Keith) Documents replaced to put in correct order on 4/19/2021 by JCK (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IncredibleBank. Scott D Bloomquist served on 3/19/2021. (Dennen, Keith) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/24/21. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Scott D Bloomquist. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JBR) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4664180.), filed by Incredible Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennen, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth J. McGuire, Jr.(Designation Retained)