This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2021 at 08:13:36 (UTC).

In the name of the United States v. US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 In the name of the United States filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01437

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

In the United States of America for the use and benefit of Concierge Solutions, Inc.

United States

Defendants

US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc.

Veteran Affairs

National Cemeteries Administration

RLI Insurance Company

Contracting Bonding and Insurance Company

Surety Company A

Surety Company B

Department of Veteran Affairs

Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francisco L. Charles-Gomez

Attorney at RJ-1 Amazona St.

Trujillo Alto, Pr 00976

Trujillo Alto, PR 00976

Defendant Attorney

Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. Responses due by 11/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, Department of Veteran Affairs, National Cemeteries Administration, RLI Insurance Company, US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

4 #4

Summons Summons

4 #3

Summons Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #2 Complaint,, filed by United States (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons) (Charles-Gomez, Francisco) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

2 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 15

2 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 14

2 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 12

2 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 11

2 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10

2 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9

2 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

2 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

2 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#2

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer due by December 3, 2021. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2021. (brc) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. Responses due by 11/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company, Department of Veteran Affairs, National Cemeteries Administration, RLI Insurance Company, US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #2 Complaint,, filed by United States (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons) (Charles-Gomez, Francisco) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against In the United States of America for the use and benefit of Concierge Solutions, Inc., filed by In the United States of America for the use and benefit of Concierge Solutions, Inc.. Service due by 12/13/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Charles-Gomez, Francisco) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Contracting Bonding and Insurance Company, National Cemeteries Administration, RLI Insurance Company, Surety Company A, Surety Company B, US Diversified Contracting Services, Inc., Veteran Affairs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7452834.), filed by In the United States of America for the use and benefit of Concierge Solutions, Inc.. Service due by 12/13/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Charles-Gomez, Francisco) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where RLI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant