This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2020 at 07:55:35 (UTC).

In the matter of the tax indebtedness of: Gary Dunn and Barbara Dunn

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 In the matter of the tax indebtedness of Gary Dunn and Barbara Dunn was filed as a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Eric F. Melgren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-MC-00103

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

United States of America

Debtor In Possession

Gary Dunn

Barbara Dunn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Emily B. Metzger

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Wichita

301 North Main Street, Suite 1200

Wichita, KS 67202-4812

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Return Declaration of Revenue Officer

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing of Return of Service by United States of America re #5 Order on Motion for Order (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

6 #1

Return Declaration of Revenue Officer

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing of Return Service by United States of America re #3 Order of Entry (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR ENTRY ON PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY granting #4 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/4/2020. (sz) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

4 #1

Declaration

#4

(#4) AMENDED APPLICATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO ENTER PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY by United States of America. (Amendment to #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Metzger, Emily) Modified on 3/4/2020 to retitle. (mam) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER FOR ENTRY on Premises to Effect Levy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/28/20. (aw) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Movant United States of America. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #1

Declaration of Revenue Officer

#1

(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Application to Enter Premises filed by Emily B. Metzger on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (mam) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing of Return of Service by United States of America re #5 Order on Motion for Order (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing of Return Service by United States of America re #3 Order of Entry (Attachments: #1 Return Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR ENTRY ON PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY granting #4 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/4/2020. (sz) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED APPLICATION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO ENTER PREMISES TO EFFECT LEVY by United States of America. (Amendment to #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Metzger, Emily) Modified on 3/4/2020 to retitle. (mam) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER FOR ENTRY on Premises to Effect Levy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/28/20. (aw) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Movant United States of America. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Application to Enter Premises filed by Emily B. Metzger on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Revenue Officer)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less