This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 08:25:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ESTABLISHMENT INSPECTION OF CHESAPEAKE CONTRACTING GROUP INC.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 IN THE MATTER OF ESTABLISHMENT INSPECTION OF CHESAPEAKE CONTRACTING GROUP INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00141

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

In Re

IN THE MATTER OF ESTABLISHMENT INSPECTION OF CHESAPEAKE CONTRACTING GROUP INC.

Interested Party

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Benton Gregory Peterson

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Return of Service by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR re Warrant Issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR re 1 MOTION for Inspection Warrant Under the Occupational Safety and Health Act, 2 MOTION for Administrative Inspection Warrant Under the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing of Return of Service by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR re Warrant Issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • WARRANT FOR INSPECTION issued by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcdw) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of filing by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR re 1 MOTION for Inspection Warrant Under the Occupational Safety and Health Act, 2 MOTION for Administrative Inspection Warrant Under the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less