This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 09:53:25 (UTC).

In the Matter of Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 In the Matter of Cooper Marine Timberlands Corporation was filed as a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cooper Marine & Timberlands Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Donald C. Radcliff

Attorney at Brady Radcliff & Brown LLP

Po Box 1668

Mobile, AL 36633

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Notice to Claimants

#2

(#2) Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, Directing Issuance of Notice & Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Filing of claims due 6/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/9/2020. (Attachment: #1 Notice to Claimants) (tot) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

1 #5

Text of Proposed Order Notice to Claimants

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation

1 #3

Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation for Value

1 #2

Affidavit John Stokes Affidavit

1 #1

Affidavit W. T. Ames Affidavit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by COOPER MARINE & TIMBERLANDS CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2590572, Online Credit Card Payment). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit W. T. Ames Affidavit, #2 Affidavit John Stokes Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation, #5 Text of Proposed Order Notice to Claimants) (Radcliff, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, Directing Issuance of Notice & Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Filing of claims due 6/5/2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/9/2020. (Attachment: #1 Notice to Claimants) (tot) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #1 Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by COOPER MARINE & TIMBERLANDS CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2590572, Online Credit Card Payment). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit W. T. Ames Affidavit, #2 Affidavit John Stokes Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Stipulation, #5 Text of Proposed Order Notice to Claimants) (Radcliff, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less