This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 10:29:37 (UTC).

IN RE:STUBHUB REFUND LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 IN RE STUBHUB REFUND LITIGATION was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-MD-02951

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew McMillan

Stephanie Wood

Michelle Kopfmann

Nina Dobner

Jason Alcaraz

Defendants

Last Minute Transaction, Inc.

StubHub, Inc.

In Re

IN RE:STUBHUB REFUND LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas A. Coulson

Attorney at Liddle and Dubin, P.C.

975 E. Jefferson Avenue

Detroit, MI 48207

Steven D. Liddle

Attorney at Liddle and Dubin, P.C.

975 E. Jefferson Avenue

Detroit, MI 48207

Nancy Hersh

Attorney at Hersh & Hersh

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102

J. Burkett McInturff

Attorney at Wittels McInturff Palikovic

18 Half Mile Road

Armonk, NY 10504

Tiasha Palikovic

Attorney at Wittels McInturff Palikovic

18 Half Mile Road

Armonk, NY 10504

Tina Wolfson

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, P.C.

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Theodore Walter Maya

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, P.C.

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Bradley Keith King

Attorney at Ahdoot and Wolfson, P.C.

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Steven Lance Wittels

Attorney at Wittels McInturff Palikovic

950 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Michael Lawrence Schrag

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Joshua Jacob Bloomfield

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1100

Oakland, CA 94612

Tekesha Geel

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street,, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Hayley A Reynolds

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Ste 1250, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

Seth A. Safier

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Yeremey O. Krivoshey

Attorney at Bursor Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Scott A. Bursor

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1420

Miami, FL 33131

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

William Patrick Donovan, Jr.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Emilie E O'Toole

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel R Campbell

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LL)

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60601

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Reynolds' Complaint filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to re Emilie E. O'Toole. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to re Daniel R. Campbell. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Emilie E. O'Toole. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885765.) filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. (O'Toole, Emilie) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Daniel R. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885649.) filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#14

(#14) Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Tina Wolfson and Tiasha Palikovic as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byStephanie Wood. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit 2

#9

(#14) Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Tina Wolfson and Tiasha Palikovic as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byStephanie Wood. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Matthew McMillan of Appearance of Counsel (Hersh, Nancy) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#8) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Steven D. Liddle. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#7) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Nicholas A. Coulson. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #2 Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF JOINT PROPOSED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#3) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #2 Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF JOINT PROPOSED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 2951 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSet Deadline, See Docket No. 21 : Statement due by 10/1/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Plaintiff Diane Reynolds TO SHOW CAUSE why her complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, given Plaintiff's failure to respond to Dkt. No. #20 Defendants' motion to dismiss by the September 23, 2020, deadline. Plaintiff Reynolds shall file a statement of two pages or less by October 1, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Reynolds' Complaint filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to re Emilie E. O'Toole. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to re Daniel R. Campbell. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Emilie E. O'Toole. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885765.) filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. (O'Toole, Emilie) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Daniel R. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885649.) filed by Last Minute Transaction, Inc., StubHub, Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Hearing as to #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, See Docket No. #14 : Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Order re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Tina Wolfson and Tiasha Palikovic as Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Stephanie Wood. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Tina Wolfson and Tiasha Palikovic as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byStephanie Wood. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT GIBBS LAW GROUP AND BURSOR & FISHER AS CO-LEAD INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL filed by Michelle Kopfmann. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Schrag, #2 Exhibit A to Schrag Declaration, #3 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, #4 Exhibit A. to Fisher Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Tina Wolfson and Tiasha Palikovic as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Stephanie Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Steven D. Liddle. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Nicholas A. Coulson. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Matthew McMillan of Appearance of Counsel (Hersh, Nancy) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Steven D. Liddle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14825596.) filed by Matthew McMillan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Liddle, Steven) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Nicholas A. Coulson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14824801.) filed by Matthew McMillan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Coulson, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #2 Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF JOINT PROPOSED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JOINT PROPOSED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, filed by Michelle Kopfmann, Stephanie Wood, Jason Alcaraz, Matthew McMillan, Nina Dobner, StubHub, Inc., Last Minute Transaction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 2951 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Last Minute Transactions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where STUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P Donovan, Jr