This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 08:08:22 (UTC).

In re: Zohar III, Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 In re Zohar III, Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01874

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Appellants

Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC

Ark Investment Partners II, LP

Octaluna III, LLC

Ark Angels III, LLC

Octaluna LLC

Zohar Holdings, LLC

Octaluna II, LLC

Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd.

Ark Angels II, LLC

Ark Angels VIII, LLC

Patriarch Partners XV, LLC

Ark Angels, LLC

Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC

Lynn Tilton

Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC

Debtor and Appellee

Zohar III, Corp.

Appellees

Zohar CDO 2003-1, Limited

Zohar III, Corp.

Zohar II 2005-1, Limited

Zohar III, Limited

Zohar II 2005-1, Corp.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

G. David Dean, II

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Norman L. Pernick

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Patrick J. Reilley

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Debtor Attorney

Michael Sean Neiburg

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Ryan M. Bartley

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael R. Nestor

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Other Attorneys

Timothy P. Cairns

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Laura Davis Jones

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

 

Court Documents

#40

#38

#37

#36

#34

17 #2

Certificate of Service

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

4 #7

Exhibit F (Order Decision Tr. 2019.09.27)

4 #6

Exhibit E (Tr. 2019.09.24)

4 #5

Exhibit D (Tr. 2019.09.05, D.I. 908)

4 #4

Exhibit C (Order Approving Settlement Agreement, D.I. 266)

4 #1

Certificate of Compliance

#2

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) REDACTED VERSION of #39 Appendix,, by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Reilley, Patrick) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) [SEALED] APPENDIX re #38 Appellant's Brief, by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reilley, Patrick) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Appellant's BRIEF by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Reilley, Patrick) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene // Motion of MBIA Insurance Corporation for Leave to Intervene as Appellee Pursuant to Rule 8013(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER ADOPTING #34 RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Recommendation is ADOPTED and this matter is withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS and ORDERS the following briefing schedule purposed by the parties: Opening Brief: 11/8/2019; Answering Brief: 12/9/2019; Reply Brief: 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from counsel to Patriarch and the Debtors regarding Joint Statement on Briefing Schedule - re #34 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation, #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,,. (Reilley, Patrick) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Local Rule 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #17 MOTION to Intervene // Motion of MBIA Insurance Corporation for Leave to Intervene as Appellee Pursuant to Rule 8013(g) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order)(Jones, Laura) Modified on 11/7/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/7/19. (cak) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #33 MOTION (Unopposed) to Increase Word Count In Reply In Further Support of Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process re #32 Appellant's Reply Brief - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the word count is increased from 2,600 words to 3,900 words. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/6/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION (Unopposed) to Increase Word Count In Reply In Further Support of Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process re #32 Appellant's Reply Brief, - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Reilley, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATEMENT // Patriarch's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 8012 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Lynn Tilton re #4 MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process by Lynn Tilton. (Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Stay // Appellants' Motion For a Stay Pending Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order Compelling Continuation of the Joint Monetization Process - filed by Ark Angels II, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Ark Investment Partners II, LP, LD Investments, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Zohar Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #3 Exhibit B (Bankruptcy Court Order, D.I. 974), #4 Exhibit C (Order Approving Settlement Agreement, D.I. 266), #5 Exhibit D (Tr. 2019.09.05, D.I. 908), #6 Exhibit E (Tr. 2019.09.24), #7 Exhibit F (Order Decision Tr. 2019.09.27), #8 Certificate of Service)(Pernick, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • (#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, October 22, 2019, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/8/19. (cak) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 09/27/2019 by Honorable Judge Karen B. Owen in Bankruptcy case number 18-10512 (KBO). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Zohar Holdings, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Ltd., Lynn Tilton, Octaluna III, LLC, Ark Investment Partners II, LP, Ark Angels VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, LD Investments, LLC, Ark Angels, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Ark Angels III, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Ark Angels II, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners, XIV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on Appeal)(mal) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zohar CDO 2003-1, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zohar II 2005-1, LLC is a litigant