This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:37:16 (UTC).

In Re: Zohar III, Corp., et al.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 In Re Zohar III, Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas L. Ambro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ambro

 

Party Details

Appellants

Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC

Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC

Patriarch Partners XV, LLC

Octaluna, LLC

Octaluna II, LLC

Octaluna III, LLC

Lynn Tilton

Debtor

Zohar III, Corp., et al.

Appellees

Bardin Hill Investment Partners

MBIA Inc.

MBIA Insurance Corporation

Credit Value Partners, LP

Halcyon

Capital Management LP

Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.

Varde Partners, Inc.

Ascension Alpha Fund LLC

Ascension Health Master Pension Trust

CAZ Halcyon Offshore Strategic Opportunities Fund, L.P.

CAZ Halcyon Strategic Opportunities Fund, L.P.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Norman L. Pernick

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew John Roth-Moore

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

G. David Dean, II

Attorney at Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Paul Ward

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Morgan Lea Patterson

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Laura Davis Jones

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Timothy P. Cairns

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Other Attorneys

Robert J. Dehney

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Matthew B. Harvey

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

John W. Weiss

Attorney at Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.

101 Crawfords Corner Road, Ste 4202

Holmdel, NJ 07733

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) APPENDIX re #30 Appellant's Brief, #31 Appendix, [Redacted Version] by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#30

(#30) Appellant's BRIEF by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#29

(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants-Appellees' Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal [Docket No. 17] by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation re #17 Designation of Record on Appeal,,, (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#28

(#28) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MBIA Inc. for MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua P. Arnold of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael E. Petrella of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean F. OShea of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#17

(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants-Appellees' Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal [Docket No. 17] by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation re #17 Designation of Record on Appeal,,, (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton (Appellants' Designation of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8009(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure). (Dean, G.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Thomas L. Ambro of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. (includes related cases). Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 4/11/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (srs) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

1 #3

Party List

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) APPENDIX re #30 Appellant's Brief, #31 Appendix, [Redacted Version] by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) [SEALED] APPENDIX re #30 Appellant's Brief by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Appellant's BRIEF by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants-Appellees' Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal [Docket No. 17] by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation re #17 Designation of Record on Appeal,,, (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MBIA Inc. for MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua P. Arnold of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael E. Petrella of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean F. OShea of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michele C. Maman of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ingrid Bagby of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by MBIA Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Appellants' Motion for an Order Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record of Appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Ambro on 4/13/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Seal (Appellants' Motion for an Order Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated for Inclusion in Record of Appeal) - filed by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Dean, G.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Lynn Tilton (Appellants' Designation of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8009(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure). (Dean, G.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Thomas L. Ambro of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (TLA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Thomas L. Ambro of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. (includes related cases). Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 4/11/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's #Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4/21/2022 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Daniel Taylor, Law Clerk for Judge Thynge (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov). Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/1/2022. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (srs) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (srs) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (srs) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 03/25/2022 by Honorable Karen B. Owens in Bankruptcy case number 19-50390. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #3 Party List)(srs) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zohar III, LLC is a litigant