This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2020 at 19:27:51 (UTC).

In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 In Re ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-ML-02905

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs

Md Ullah

John Seward

Joshua Kim

Noe Riveron

Krystina Bonilla

Alejandro Ramirez

Elizabeth Evans

Courtney Maine

Alexander Perez

Charles Williams

Marlene Martinez

Michael Van Ness

Defendants

Liaison Counsel for Defendants

Toyota Motor Corp

Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc

KIA Motor America, Inc

Honda R and D Americas, Inc

Honda of America Mfg., Inc.

In Re

ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation

139 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David K Stein

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 14Th Street Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Jeffrey B Kosbie

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

505 - 14Th Street Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Stacey P Slaughter

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Laurence D King

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1560

Oakland, CA 94612

John Gravante, III

Podhurst Orseck Pa, 1 Se 3Rd Avenue Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lynn L Sarko

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Erika M Keech

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Mark J Dearman

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

James E Cecchi

Attorney at Carella Byrne Bain Gilfillan Cecchi Stewart and Olstein

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Stacey M Kaplan

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

One Sansome Street Suite 1850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Mark V Berry

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Lance A Etcheverry

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

Other Attorneys

Jeremy Keith Robinson

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield LLP

110 Laurel Street

San Diego, CA 92101

H Clay Barnett, III

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis and Miles PC

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Stephen A D'Aunoy

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

St Louis, MO 63101

Matthew J Preusch

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1129 State Street Suite 8

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Jerome H Mooney

Attorney at Weston Garrou and Mooney

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 525

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1176

Elizabeth Joan Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Kacey Renee Riccomini

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2029 Century Park East 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

147 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#92

#90

#91

#89

78 #4

Exhibit C

78 #3

Exhibit B

78 #2

Exhibit A

78 #1

Declaration

#78

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tyler E Ulrich on behalf of Plaintiffs Courtney Maine, Carl Paul Maurilus, Adalgisa Santos (Attorney Tyler E Ulrich added to party Courtney Maine(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler E Ulrich added to party Carl Paul Maurilus(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler E Ulrich added to party Adalgisa Santos(pty:pla))(Ulrich, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachel E Morowitz counsel for Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Jennifer Johnson, Steve Keister, Desiree Meyer. Adding Rachel E. Morowitz as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Jennifer Johnson, Steve Keister, Desiree Meyer for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Jennifer Johnson, Steve Keister, and Desiree Meyer. (Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Thomas Copley(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Marvin Coyner(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Elizabeth Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Regina Heilman-Ryan(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Jennifer Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Steve Keister(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel E Morowitz added to party Desiree Meyer(pty:pla))(Morowitz, Rachel) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #78 APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel W. Daniel "Dee" Miles III as attorney of record instead of Edward F. Kickham Jr., Jamie K. Warrow and Gregory D. Hanley for Plaintiff Sigfredo Rubio. (lom) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) NOTICE of Unanimous Support of Plaintiffs' Revised Proposed Leadership Structure filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hernandez, Tammy Tyler. (Stellings, David) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. Changing address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3700 Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing fax to 310-552-5900. Filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Holscher, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas counsel for Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. Changing address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3700 Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing fax to 310-552-5900. Filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ROSEMARY M. RIVAS AS CO- LEAD COUNSEL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO THE PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE filed by plaintiff Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC. Application set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - CV of Rosemary M. Rivas, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Firm Resume of Levi & Korsinsky, LLP) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel (Matthew Regan (Kirkland & Ellis LLP) Regarding Defendants Liaison Counsel) filed by Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Automotive, Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. Application set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attorney Matthew T Regan added to party TRW Automotive U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Regan added to party TRW Automotive, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Regan added to party TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Regan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Statement of Matthew Regan #81 , for the following reasons: The document is filed as a Statement and not an Application and it is not properly noticed for a hearing as instructed by the Court's Order. Dkt. 5. If counsel wishes to refile it by January 22, 2020, it will be accepted as timely. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel (Gayle M. Blatt to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee) filed by Plaintiff Robert A Underwood. Application set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gayle M. Blatt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Blatt, Gayle) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Process Specialist for Registered Agent of service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 9/16/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Felicia Jeffries, Danny Bustamante, Judith Servis, Michael Hernandez, John Seward, Desiree Meyer, Joshua Kim, Tonya McNeely, William Hauser, Eric Ruiz, Steve Croft, Gary Samouris, Ann Harland, James F Bliss, Jessica Kelly, Carolyn Nelson, Gerald Strauss, Md Ullah, Jennifer Johnson, Regina Heilman-Ryan, Alexander Perez, Thomas Payne, Bridget Miller, Jason Klein, James Carroll, Michael Hines, William Baerresen, Thomas H. Price, Eldon Painter, Grissell Denizard, Charles Williams, Richard Narez, Donna Richards, Moises Senti, Curtis Resta, Gilberto Perez, Eric Fishon, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Andrea Shields, Carma Rockers, Eduardo Consuegra, Maureen Heiner, Christina McCormick, Larry Flowers, Diana King, Marlene Martinez, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Margaret Rizzo, Vania Silva, Evan Green, Tina Fuller, Alexia Bouclier, Elizabeth Evans, Tammy Tyler, Brent DeRouen, Armando Paz, Jr, Nicholas Crouch, Noe Riveron, Adalgisa Santos, Cynthia Sacchetti, Sigfredo Rubio, Angela Bowens, Juan Zamora, Kathy Cleghorn, Dee Roberts, Mark Altier, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Alice Smith, Mark D. Altier, Laura Shimko, Lynn Cox, Ryan Baldwin, Andrea Acosta, Courtney Maine, Alejandro Ramirez, Tommy Bentley, Remi Rundzio, Nida Edith Samson, Kevin Burns, Bernadette Polansky, Jami S Oliver, Amanda Swanson, Erin Reilly, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Curline Registe, Xin Wang, Ryan Frazier, Jason Janson, Cynthia Acker, David Radi, Michael Van Ness, Yoni Breve, Bilal Mohammad Ali, Krystina Bonilla, Tonya Skinner, Rex Weston, Maximillian Accetta, Russell Steel, Alejandra Renteria, Samuel Choc, Matthew Aquino, Steve Keister, ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, Dragan Jagnjic, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Fredericka McPherson, Christy Sullivan, Thomas Copley, William Bell, Carolyn McFadden, Yamira Collazo, Billy Blaylock, Robert A Underwood, Jose Portillo, Alvin Duncan, Kaya Lawrence, Gaylynn Sanchez, Hamilton Livery Leasing LLC, Marvin Coyner, Joseph Fuller, Sr., Ryan Crespo, Christopher Berry, Linda Cooper, Brian Chaiken, Kinyata Jones, Carl Paul Maurilus, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Greene Intake Manager for Registered agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blatt, Gayle) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jp). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandi L. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24436727) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riccomini, Kacey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc, Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc (Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent Galvin, Jr added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc(pty:dft))(Galvin, Vincent) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter G Safirstein on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Van Ness (Attorney Peter G Safirstein added to party Michael Van Ness(pty:pla))(Safirstein, Peter) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (ALL CASES) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Because these complex cases warrant appropriate oversight and collaborative management, counsel shall refer to this Order for details. An Initial Conference is set for February 24, 2020 at 1:30 pm. Counsel for all parties shall appear. (ake) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PREPARATION OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This Court has been assigned MDL No. 2905 (the "MDL"). Any individual case that this Court or the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation relates to the MDL will be closed. All filings shall be made in the docket of the MDL uponthe transfer of the individual case as stated in this Order. (ake) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. With the consent of that court, all such actions havebeen assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. With the consent of that court, all such actions have been assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (lom) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:19-ml-02905-JAK-FFMx, In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for Discovery. (car) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less