This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 08:05:59 (UTC).

In Re. Woods et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 In Re Woods was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11379

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Appellant

Susan Woods

Hadley, MA 01035

Appellee and Trustee

Joseph B. Collins

Springfield, MA 01103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Joseph B. Collins

Attorney at Hendel & Collins, PC

101 State Street

Springfield, MA 01103

 

Court Documents

4 #3

Part 4

4 #2

Part 3

4 #1

Part 2

#4

(#4) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #1

Initial Transmittal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-03010. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 8/15/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/29/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/12/2019. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-03010. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less