This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 09:01:45 (UTC).

In Re. Woodard

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 In Re Woodard was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-30140

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Daniel Woodard

Appellees

IndyMac Federal Bank F.S.B.

Deutsche Bank National Trust Co.

Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C.

Not Classified By Court

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

David G. Baker

236 Huntington Avenue, Ste. 317

Boston, MA 02115

Appellee Attorneys

Robert A. McCall

Attorney at Peabody & Arnold LLP

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210-2261

Kurt R. McHugh

Attorney at Harmon Law Offices, P.C.

P.O. Box 610389

Newton Highlands, MA 02461-0389

Jeffery J. Hardiman

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh, P.C.

270 Farmington Avenue, #151

Farmington, CT 06032

Jeffrey L. McCormick

Attorney at Robinson Donovan, P.C.

Suite 1600, 1500 Main Street

Springfield, MA 01115

Jeffrey J. Trapani

Attorney at Robinson Donovan, P.C.

1500 Main Street, Suite 1600

Springfeild, MA 01115

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Richard T. Mulligan

Attorney at Harmon Law Offices, P.C

150 California Street

Newton, MA 02458

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Initial Transmittal

#10

(#10) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Memo in Support)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/11/2019) to rotate pages (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-03043. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit Memo in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18 to File Opening Brief, by Daniel Woodard.(Baker, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

4 #2

Transmittal of Complete Record

#4

(#4) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal of Complete Record)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Trapani on behalf of Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C. (Trapani, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 8, 2020 to File Response/Reply by Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C..(Trapani, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit

10 #1

Exhibit Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • (#12) Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellee Brief due by 1/8/2020. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief. Brief due by 1/8/2020 (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 8, 2020 to File Response/Reply by Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C..(Trapani, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Memo in Support)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/11/2019) to rotate pages (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18 to File Opening Brief, by Daniel Woodard.(Baker, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Trapani on behalf of Reiner, Reiner and Bendett, P.C. (Trapani, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 12/4/2019. Appellee Brief due by 12/18/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/2/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Transmittal of Complete Record)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-03043. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.