Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:33:32 (UTC).

In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10354

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.

Appellant

Strategic Global Management, Inc.

Debtors

Verity Medical Foundation

Verity Health System of California, Inc.

Verity Business Services

Verity Holdings, LLC

St. Francis Medical Center of Lynwood Foundation

St. Vincent Medical Center

De Paul Ventures-San Jose Dialysis, LLC

O'Connor Hospital Foundation

St. Vincent Dialysis Center, Inc.

De Paul Ventures, LLC

St. Vincent Foundation

Seton Medical Center Foundation

Seton Medical Center

O'Connor Hospital

Saint Louise Regional Hospital

Saint Louise Regional Hospital Foundation

St. Francis Medical Center

Appellees and Debtors

California Department of Health Care Services

Verity Health System of California, Inc.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mark Shinderman

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory Allan Bray

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

James Cornell Behrens

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant Attorneys

John-Patrick M Fritz

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gary E Klausner

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Xavier Becerra

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Kenneth Kai-Chun Wang

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Jennifer M Kim

Attorney at CAAG - Office of CA Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Nicholas A Koffroth

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Samuel R Maizel

Attorney at Dentons LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motions to Intervene #17 ; Order GRANTING Motion to Consolidate Appeals1. All further filings are to be made in CV 19-10352 DSF alone, and the Clerk is ordered to close cases CV 19-10354 and CV 19-10356. Consolidated briefs are to be filed in CV 19-10352 DSF following the schedule set out in the Court's 1/8/2020 order and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8000, et seq. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

26 #7

Exhibit G

26 #6

Exhibit F

26 #5

Exhibit E

26 #4

Exhibit D

26 #3

Exhibit C

26 #2

Exhibit B

#26

(#26) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Debtors' Response to Strategic Global Management, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing the Parties to: (1) Comply with General Order No. 11-10, Section 5, and District Court Local Rule 16-15; and (2) Participate in ADR Process filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#17

(#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion to Intervene #17 The Court sets the hearing on the motion for Monday, 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong counsel for Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey S. Kwong as counsel of record for Strategic Global Management, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Kwong, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) (Attorney John-Patrick M Fritz added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Fritz, John-Patrick) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . Document number 1 due to clerical error. The docket clerk enter the wrong text information and attached the wrong document to the entire image of the new action. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) U.S. BANKRUPTCY APPELLATE PANEL OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT TRANSMITTAL; Notice of transfer of appeal to district court; regarding BAP: CC-19-1311 (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT RE: ELECTION TO TRANSFER APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/2/2019. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

BK Docket Sheets

#1

(#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . Document number 1 due to clerical error. The docket clerk enter the wrong text information and attached the wrong document to the entire image of the new action. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motions to Intervene #17 ; Order GRANTING Motion to Consolidate Appeals1. All further filings are to be made in CV 19-10352 DSF alone, and the Clerk is ordered to close cases CV 19-10354 and CV 19-10356. Consolidated briefs are to be filed in CV 19-10352 DSF following the schedule set out in the Court's 1/8/2020 order and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8000, et seq. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Debtors' Response to Strategic Global Management, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing the Parties to: (1) Comply with General Order No. 11-10, Section 5, and District Court Local Rule 16-15; and (2) Participate in ADR Process filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 Debtors' Response to Strategic Global Management, Inc.'s Motion for Order Directing the Parties to: (1) Comply with General Order No. 11-10, Section 5, and District Court Local Rule 16-15; and (2) Participate in ADR Process filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 filed by Movant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.. (Behrens, James) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/7/2020. (jp) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal #2 . (jp) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Gary E. Klausner in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND #20 filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO: (1) COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER NO. 11-10, 5, AND DISTRICT COURT LOCAL RULE 16-15; AND (2) PARTICIPATE IN ADR PROCESS - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Gary E Klausner added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a)) (Klausner, Gary) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE Notice of Hearing on January 27, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. re: Motion to Intervene filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Verity Health System of California, Inc., et al.. (Behrens, James) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion to Intervene #17 The Court sets the hearing on the motion for Monday, 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellees Verity Health System of California, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-10352; 2:19-cv-10356 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong counsel for Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey S. Kwong as counsel of record for Strategic Global Management, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Kwong, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (Attorney John-Patrick M Fritz added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a))(Fritz, John-Patrick) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . Document number 1 due to clerical error. The docket clerk enter the wrong text information and attached the wrong document to the entire image of the new action. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) U.S. BANKRUPTCY APPELLATE PANEL OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT TRANSMITTAL; Notice of transfer of appeal to district court; regarding BAP: CC-19-1311 (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT RE: ELECTION TO TRANSFER APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/2/2019. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/27/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 7] NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order (1) Finding that SGM is Obligated to Promptly Close the SGM Sale Under 8.6 of the APA, Provided that all other condition to closing have been satisfied and (2) Granting Debtors' Motion for a Continuance of the hearing to approve the disclosure statement entered on 11/18/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Ernest M Robles, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 11/18/2019., filed by appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc. (ghap) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) (ghap). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 BK Docket Sheets) (ghap). Modified on 12/9/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verity Business Services is a litigant

Latest cases where DE PAUL VENTURES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STRATEGIC GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant