This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2020 at 06:57:24 (UTC).

In re USA Technologies, Inc. Securities Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 In re USA Technologies, Inc Securities Litigation was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04565

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Lead Plaintiff

Pinkesh Nahar

Plaintiff

STEPHANE GOUET

Consolidated Plaintiff

ANTHONY E PHILLIPS

Petitioners

DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM

Masbez LLC

UNIVERSITY OF PUERTO RICO RETIREMENT SYSTEM

HAROLD WEBER

RONALD R. SISSECK

ALBIN F. MOSCHNER

STEVEN D. BARNHART

NORTHLAND SECURITIES, INC.

WILLIAM J. SCHOCH

BARRINGTON RESEARCH ASSOCIATES, INC.

ROBERT L. METZGER

WILLIAM BLAIR & COMPANY, L.L.C.

Defendants

USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

STEPHEN P. HERBERT

PRIYANKA SINGH

In Re

USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff Attorneys

JACOB A. GOLDBERG

Attorney at THE ROSEN LAW FIRM

101 Greenwood Avenue, Suite 440

Jenkintown, PA 19046

LAURENCE M. ROSEN

Attorney at THE ROSEN LAW FIRM, PA

609 W. South Orange Avenue, Suite 2P

South Orange, NJ 07079

ROBERT C. FINKEL

Attorney at WOLF, POPPER, ROSS, WOLF & JONES

845 Third Avenue, 12 Floor

New York, NY 10022-6689

PHILLIP C. KIM

Attorney at THE ROSEN LAW FIRM, PA

275 Madison Avenue 34Th Fl

New York, NY 10016

CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER

Attorney at SEEGER WEISS LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Fl

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

RICHARD LEVI ELEM

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAN MEYER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

1029 Teaneck Road, 2Nd Floor

Teaneck, NJ 07666

JEFFREY W. HERRMANN

Attorney at COHN LIFLAND PEARLMAN, ET AL

JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD

Attorney at FEGAN SCOTT LLC

140 Broadway, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorney

JOEL B. STRAUSS

Attorney at KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

CASEY GENE WATKINS

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

JOHN J. CARNEY

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

TYSON Y. HERROLD

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

2929 Arch Street, Cira Centre 12Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19104

DOUGLAS W. GREENE

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

999 Third Ave Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-4040

JIMMY FOKAS

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

BARI R. NADWORNY

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

CARL W. HITTINGER

Attorney at BAKERHOSTETLER LLP

2929 Arch St, Cira Center 12Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#106

#105

#104

RESTRICTED

#103

#102

#96

95 #2

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settle

95 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order and Judgment

#95

6 #10

Certificate of Service

6 #8

Exhibit F

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

PSLRA Certification

#1

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDocument Nos. 105 & 106 mailed to attorneys. (kw, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND AWARDS TO PLFFS AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/30/20.10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS"(kw, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER THAT THIS ORDER AND JUDGMENT INCORPORATES BY REFERENCE THE DEFINITIONS IN THE SETTLEMENT STIPULATION, & ALL CAPITALIZED TERMS USED HEREIN SHALL HAVE THE SAME MEANINGS AS SET FORTH THEREIN, ETC. THE COURT HEREBY FINALLY CERTIFIES THIS ACTION AS A CLASS ACTION FOR PURPOSES OF THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 23(a) AND (b)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/30/20.10/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS" (kw, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Minute Entry, re: Video Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY on 10/30/20, re: Motion for Final Approval of Class Action settlement and Motion for attorney fees. Court grants motions (Doc. 95 & Doc. 96), etc. Court Reporter: Lynn Gilgor. (kw, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL COLLINS CLARKE on behalf of STEPHEN P. HERBERT with Certificate of Service(COLLINS CLARKE, RACHEL) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) REPLY Memorandum of Law to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION for Settlement (For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation), #96 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Awards to Plaintiffs filed by PETER FARSACI, Pinkesh Nahar, UNIVERSITY OF PUERTO RICO RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (GOLDBERG, JACOB) Modified on 10/26/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Supplemental Declaration of Josephine Bravata by PETER FARSACI, Pinkesh Nahar, UNIVERSITY OF PUERTO RICO RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (GOLDBERG, JACOB) Modified on 10/26/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Objections by TAN HUY NGUYEN. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) RESPONSE to Motion re #95 MOTION for Settlement (For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation), #96 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Awards to Plaintiffs filed by USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (KRABILL, LAURA) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDOC # 98 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 10/15/20 (rf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Counsel Attorney: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld. by RONALD R. SISSECK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration with Exhibits A-D, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LINDENFELD, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Attorney: The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., MOTION to Consolidate Cases by PINKESH NAHAR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(ROSEN, LAURENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Delaware County Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(HERRMANN, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Acceptance of Service of the Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto by STEPHANE GOUET. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEPHEN P. HERBERT, PRIYANKA SINGH, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by STEPHANE GOUET. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by STEPHANE GOUET as to STEPHEN P. HERBERT, PRIYANKA SINGH, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against STEPHEN P. HERBERT, PRIYANKA SINGH, USA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9014999) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEPHANE GOUET. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELAWARE COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF PUERTO RICO RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHLAND SECURITIES, INC. is a litigant