This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 10:12:09 (UTC).

In Re: United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 In Re United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Phil Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01460

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

 

Party Details

Appellant

United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund

Debtors

Norrenberns Foods, Inc.

Norrenberns Properties, LLC

Betty Ann Market, Inc.

Interested Parties

Office of the United States Trustee

Subchapter V Trustee

US Bankruptcy Clerk

750 Missouri Avenue

East St. Louis, IL 62201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Frank W. DiCastri

Attorney at Reinhart, Boerner, et al.

1000 North Water Street, Suite 1700

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jonathan D. Karmel

Attorney at Karmel Law Firm

221 N. Lasalle St., Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60601

Sara C McNamara

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.

1000 N. Water Street, Suite 1700

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Debtor Attorneys

Steven M. Wallace

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.

2227 South State Route 157, P.O. Box 959

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Anthony R. Garavalia

Attorney at Flynn, Guymon & Garavalia

300 West Main Street, Suite 4

Belleville, IL 62220

Interested Party Attorneys

Mark D. Skaggs

Attorney at USDOJ - Office of the U.S. Trustee - Peoria, IL

401 Main Street, 1100 Becker Building

Peoria, IL 61602-1241

Sumner A Bourne

Attorney at Rafool & Bourne P.C.

401 Main, Suite 1130

Peoria, IL 61602

US Bankruptcy Clerk

Attorney at US Bankruptcy Court

750 Missouri Avenue

East St. Louis, IL 62201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-01460-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Bankruptcy Information Sheet

#3

(#3) Letter to Attorney Frank W. DiCastri regarding Admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter to Attorney McNamara regarding admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Letter to Attorney Karmel regarding admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sara C McNamara $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4831728 by on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund. (McNamara, Sara) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W. DiCastri $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4832489 by on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund. (DiCastri, Frank) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund (McNamara, Sara) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/5/2022. (jdh) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/5/2022. (jdh) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund (McNamara, Sara) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, Granting #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sara C McNamara and #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W. DiCastri.(kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W. DiCastri $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4832489 by on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund. (DiCastri, Frank) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sara C McNamara $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4831728 by on behalf of United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund. (McNamara, Sara) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Attorney Karmel regarding admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to Attorney McNamara regarding admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Attorney Frank W. DiCastri regarding Admission to SDIL. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 21-30825. File received, filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund. Appellant Brief due by 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Information Sheet)(adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-01460-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (adh) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bankruptcy Clerk is a litigant

Latest cases where Norrenberns Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where United Food and Commercial Workers is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sumner A Bourne