This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:19:31 (UTC).

In Re The Complaint and Petition of Callan Marine, LTD.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 In Re The Complaint and Petition of Callan Marine, LTD was filed as a Contract - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew S Hanen and Frances H Stacy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02224

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

Referral Judge

Frances H Stacy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Callan Marine, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Susan D Noe Wilson

Attorney at Schouest, Bamdas, Soshea & BeMaier, PLLC

1001 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. This case is TRANSFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy for all pretrial matters to include the issuance of a Memorandum and Recommendation on any dispositive motions. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#8

(#8) CLAIM filed by Arturo Benavidez.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Arturo Benavidez, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arturo Benavidez, Anthony Buzbee, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Callan Marine, LTD., filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED ORDER for Ad Interim Stipulation for Value re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED ORDER Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claim, Directing the Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Notice of Action

1 #6

Monition

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Robert P. Vining

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Callan Marine, Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-24840614). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert P. Vining, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Monition, #7 Notice of Action, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noe Wilson, Susan) Payment information added on 6/24/2020 (ltien, 4). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Callan Marine, LTD., filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. This case is TRANSFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy for all pretrial matters to include the issuance of a Memorandum and Recommendation on any dispositive motions. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLAIM filed by Arturo Benavidez.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Arturo Benavidez, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arturo Benavidez, Anthony Buzbee, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Callan Marine, LTD., filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED ORDER for Ad Interim Stipulation for Value re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED ORDER Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claim, Directing the Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Callan Marine, Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-24840614). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert P. Vining, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Monition, #7 Notice of Action, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noe Wilson, Susan) Payment information added on 6/24/2020 (ltien, 4). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less