This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2022 at 09:02:20 (UTC).

In re: Taasera Licensing LLC, Patent Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 In re Taasera Licensing LLC, Patent Litigation was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-MD-03042

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Taasera Licensing LLC

Palo Alto Networks Inc

Trend Micro Inc

Trend Micro Incorporated

Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.

Quest Patent Research Corporation

In Re

In Re: Taasera Licensing LLC, Patent Litigation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Justin Kurt Truelove

Peter Lambrianakos

Vincent J Rubino, III

Andrew Townsend Radsch

Kelly C Hunsaker

Krishnan Padmanabhan

Michael Rueckheim

Melissa Richards Smith

Holly Elin Engelmann

Daniel James Shea, Jr

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Eric Hugh Findlay

Alyssa Margaret Caridis

Clement S Roberts

Debra E. Gunter

Evan David Brewer

Jake O'Neal

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order assigning Chief Judge Rodney Gilstrap in the Eastern District of Texas to preside over MDL No. 3042 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The following cases are transferred to the Eastern District of Texas and assigned to Chief Judge Gilstrap: NYSD 1:22cv2306 and TXND 3:22cv518. Upon receipt of this NEF, each transferor court should effect transfer without delay. (Please do not close the case before transfer but do include in the extraction function Remarks field the MDL number, title and date of this order, and a contact name. If this court should use a different contact to request a future MDL-related transfer, please notify NDTX at InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) Additionally, TXED case numbers 2:21cv441 and 2:22cv63 are included in MDL 3042. (Entered by the JPML on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER VACATING REFERRAL FOR PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/31/2022. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Palo Alto Networks Inc (klc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2022

DocketNOTICE of Hearing: In-person Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (aeb) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Palo Alto Networks Inc (klc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER VACATING REFERRAL FOR PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/31/2022. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL: Filings must be made in each and all actions to which they pertain. MDL Case 2:22MD3042 is reserved for Transfer Orders and Orders of Remand, etc. Attorneys eligible to practice before the JPML who do not already have e-filing privileges in this court may submit their request as soon as they receive the NEF indicating that the relevant case has been received from the transferor district. Please select MDL when submitting the request via PACER, and if offered the opportunity, provide the case number assigned in this district. (klc) Modified on 8/5/2022 to add instruction for requesting e-filing privileges (lrl). (Entered: 08/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order assigning Chief Judge Rodney Gilstrap in the Eastern District of Texas to preside over MDL No. 3042 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The following cases are transferred to the Eastern District of Texas and assigned to Chief Judge Gilstrap: NYSD 1:22cv2306 and TXND 3:22cv518. Upon receipt of this NEF, each transferor court should effect transfer without delay. (Please do not close the case before transfer but do include in the extraction function Remarks field the MDL number, title and date of this order, and a contact name. If this court should use a different contact to request a future MDL-related transfer, please notify NDTX at InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) Additionally, TXED case numbers 2:21cv441 and 2:22cv63 are included in MDL 3042. (Entered by the JPML on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less