This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:46:42 (UTC).

IN RE: SUBPOENA TO GLEN HAUENSTEIN

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 IN RE SUBPOENA TO GLEN HAUENSTEIN was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01654

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America, et al

Petitioners

Glen Hauenstein

Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Defendant

American Airlines Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew Jacob Tuck

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Atl

Suite 4900, 1201 West Peachtree St.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

James P. Denvir

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael S. Mitchell

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Atl

Terminus 200, Suite 2500, 3333 Piedmont Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30305

Richard J. Valladares

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Terminus 200, Suite 2500, 3333 Piedmont Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30305

Daniel M. Wall

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP-CA

Suite 2000, 505 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Protective Order; granting #1 Motion to Quash; granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/20/2022. (dob) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

11 #2

M. Mitchell Declaration Ex. 1

11 #1

M. Mitchell Declaration

11 #11

Main Document

10 #1

M. Moon Declaration

10 #10

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

4 #4

Ex. 3 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall

4 #1

Declaration of Daniel M. Wall

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Affidavit - Glen Hauenstein

1 #2

Affidavit - of Michael S. Mitchell

1 #1

Brief in Support

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (jtj) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Protective Order; granting #1 Motion to Quash; granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/20/2022. (dob) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY BRIEF re #1 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Subpoena Reply In Support filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein. (Attachments: #1 M. Mitchell Declaration, #2 M. Mitchell Declaration Ex. 1)(Tuck, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing,, filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein. (Attachments: #1 M. Moon Declaration)(Tuck, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel M. Wall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11764806).. Attorney Daniel M. Wall added appearing on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (gas) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel M. Wall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11764806).by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Valladares, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Subpoena, #8 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing,to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (adg) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:22-mi-00029-MHC-CCB. (adg) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #7 Notice of Filing,, by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valladares, Richard) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Defendant's Opposition To Motion For Protective Order And To Quash Deposition Subpoena To Glen Hauenstein by American Airlines Group Inc. re #4 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Opposition To Motion For Protective Order And To Quash Deposition Subpoena To Glen Hauenstein, #2 Ex. 8 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #3 Ex. 9 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #4 Ex. 10 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #5 Ex. 11 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #6 Ex. 12 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #7 Ex. 13 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall)(Valladares, Richard) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #2 Ex. 1 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #3 Ex. 2 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #4 Ex. 3 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #5 Ex. 4 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #6 Ex. 5 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #7 Ex. 6 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #8 Ex. 7 to Declaration of Daniel M. Wall)(Valladares, Richard) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Mitchell by CRD at the direction of the court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Denvir by CRD at the direction of the court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Mitchell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11730916).. Attorney Michael S. Mitchell added appearing on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein (gas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Denvir Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11730881).. Attorney James P. Denvir added appearing on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein (gas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Mitchell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11730916).by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein. (Tuck, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Denvir Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11730881).by Delta Air Lines, Inc., Glen Hauenstein. (Tuck, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order; and MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11727404 (eop) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Protective Order; and MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena to Glen Hauenstein with Brief In Support by Delta Air Lines, Inc and Glen Hauenstein. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit - of Michael S. Mitchell, #3 Affidavit - Glen Hauenstein, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J. Tuck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL S MITCHELL