This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2019 at 07:51:38 (UTC).

In re: Subpoena Duces Tecum to Verizon Wireless

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 In re Subpoena Duces Tecum to Verizon Wireless was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theodore D. Chuang and Charles B. Day. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02121

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theodore D. Chuang

Referral Judge

Charles B. Day

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Mack

Danita Ingram

Thomas Boone

Richard Torres

Michael Brown

Chris Smith

Hispanic National Law Enforcement Association NCR, et al.

Tasha Oatis

Patrick McClam

Clarence Rucker

Sonya Zollicoffer

Adrian Crudup

Joseph Perez

Sharon Chambers

United Black Police Officers Association

Petitioner

Todd Lightner

Defendants

Mark A. Magaw

Major Kathleen Mills

Christopher Murtha

Henry P. Stawinski, III

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Arak Freedman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Dennis A Corkery

Attorney at Washington Lawyers Cmte for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs

700 14Th St. Nw Ste 400

Washington, DC 20005

Petitioner Attorney

Patrick Joseph McAndrew

Attorney at Law Offices of Patrick J. McAndrew, LLC.

6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 408

Greenbelt, MD 20770-6300

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#6

#12

#12

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#4

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

#2

1 #2

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING Petitioners' Motions for Protective Orders and DENYING Petitioners' Motions to Quash re (1 in 8:19-cv-02120-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02120-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Joseph Ghattas, (1 in 8:19-cv-02121-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02121-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Todd Lightner, (1 in 8:19-cv-01799-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-01799-TDC) filed by Prince George's County, (1 in 8:19-cv-02122-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02122-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hector Velez, (1 in 8:19-cv-01806-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-01806-TDC) filed by Henry P. Stawinski, (1 in 8:19-cv-01808-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-01808-TDC) filed by Christopher R. Murtha, (1 in 8:19-cv-02123-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02123-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02118-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02118-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mistinette Mints, (1 in 8:19-cv-01744-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-01744-TDC) filed by Kathleen Mills, (1 in 8:19-cv-02119-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02119-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by William Alexander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/16/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01744-TDC et al.(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/13/2019. Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01744-TDC et al.(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order Subpoena Issued to Verizon Wireless filed by Michael Anis, Thomas Boone, Michael Brown, Sharon Chambers, Adrian Crudup, Hispanic National Law Enforcement Association NCR, et al., Danita Ingram, Todd Lightner, Paul Mack, Patrick McClam, Tasha Oatis, Joseph Perez, Clarence Rucker, Chris Smith, Richard Torres, United Black Police Officers Association, Thomas Wall, Sonya Zollicoffer.(Freedman, John) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Arak Freedman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Freedman, John) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Memorandum re (1 in 8:19-cv-02120-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02120-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02121-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02121-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02122-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02122-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02123-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02123-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02118-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02118-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, (1 in 8:19-cv-02119-TDC, 1 in 8:19-cv-02119-TDC) MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hector Velez.Associated Cases: 8:19-cv-01744-TDC et al.(McAndrew, Patrick) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for all Discovery and Related Scheduling. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/23/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-mc-00101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/18/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Information by TODD LIGHTNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER requiring Petitioner to notify the Court on or before 6/21/2019, whether he consents to transfer of this matter to the United Stated District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/12/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616098710. (jf) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order by TODD LIGHTNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Black Police Officers Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Hispanic National Law Enforcement Association NCR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Joseph McAndrew