This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2021 at 09:07:30 (UTC).

In re: Stream TV Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 In re Stream TV Networks, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Debtor and Appellant

Stream TV Networks, Inc.

Appellees

SLS Holdings VI, LLC

SeeCubic, Inc.

United States Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Christopher A. Ward

Brenna A. Dolphin

Shanti Mulpuru Katona

Appellee Attorneys

Davis Lee Wright

Gabriel Hartsell

Joseph O. Larkin

Jason M. Liberi

Rosa Sierra

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Certificate of Service

#18

#17

#15

#12

#11

#9

#5

#4

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

#2

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#21) Remark: A letter dated 8/4/2021, from Mathu Rajan CEO of Stream TV Networks, Inc., was received on 8/6/2021, regarding mediation. The letter will not be filed as Stream TV Networks, Inc. is represented by counsel. (nms) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORAL ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference re: Mediation is set for 8/13/2021 at 09:30 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for appellees (in both 21-889-RGA and 21-899-RGA) to originate the call to chambers. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/5/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00889-RGA, 1:21-cv-00899-RGA(Taylor, Daniel) Modified on 8/5/2021 (Taylor, Daniel). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Rosa Sierra on behalf of United States Trustee (Sierra, Rosa) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Counterstatement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal and Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by SeeCubic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larkin, Joseph) Modified on 7/22/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Gabriel Hartsell for SLS Holdings VI, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Statement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal and Designation of Record on Appeal, filed by Stream TV Networks, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) Modified on 7/9/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#16) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 7/22/21 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Daniel Taylor, Law Clerk for Judge Thynge (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov). Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/7/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Emergency MOTION for Stay Pending Appeal of Order Granting Emergency Motion for an Order Dismissing Involuntary Chapter 7 Case filed by Stream TV Networks, Inc. (D.I. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2021. (lak) Modified on 7/1/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Galen, filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittany S. Ogden, filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alissa Brice Castaeda, filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gabriel M. Hartsell, filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eben P. Colby, filed by SeeCubic, Inc., and #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marley Ann Brumme, filed by SeeCubic, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2021. (nms) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00889-RGA, 1:21-cv-00899-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Galen - filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC. (Wright, Davis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alissa Brice Castaeda - filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC. (Wright, Davis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittany S. Ogden - filed by SLS Holdings VI, LLC. (Wright, Davis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Lee Wright on behalf of SLS Holdings VI, LLC (Wright, Davis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: A response to the Emergency Stay Motion (D.I. #3 ) shall be filed no later than June 25, 2021. A reply, if any, in further support of the Emergency Stay Motion shall be filed no later than June 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/23/2021. (nms) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION for Stay Pending Appeal of Order Granting Emergency Motion for an Order Dismissing Involuntary Chapter 7 Case, filed by Stream TV Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Christopher) Modified on 6/23/2021 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (kmd) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (kmd) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 6/10/2021 by the Honorable Karen B. Owens in Bankruptcy case number 21-10848-KBO. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Stream TV Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(kmd) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less