This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 07:01:59 (UTC).

In Re Sonoma West Medical Center

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 In Re Sonoma West Medical Center was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07080

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Timothy W. Hoffman

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC

Gurpreet Singh

American Advanced Management Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John H. MacConaghy

Attorney at MacConaghy and Barnier

645 1St Street W #D

Sonoma, CA 95476

John Harrington MacConaghy, Esq.

Attorney at MacConaghy & Barnier, PLC

645 First Street West

Sonoma, CA 95476

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Steven G. Polard

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND PERMITTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/19. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#8

(#8) Reply in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

6 #25

Exhibit 25 -- Answer to Counterclaim

6 #24

Exhibit 24 -- Answer and Counterclaim -- Hoffman v. SSH et al

6 #13

Exhibit 13-- Declaration in Support thereof

6 #11

Exhibit 11-- Order to Compel Turnover

6 #10

Exhibit 10 -- SSH Opposition to Motion to Compel Turnover

6 #9

Exhibit 9 -- Motion to Compel Turnover

6 #8

Exhibit 8 -- Order for Examination

6 #7

Exhibit 7 -- 10/22/19 Transcript of Hearing

6 #6

Exhibit 6 -- 9/9/19 Transcript of Hearing

6 #5

Exhibit 5 -- Declaration of Austin Wade

6 #4

Exhibit 4 -- Declaration of John MacConaghy

6 #3

Exhibit 3 -- Declaration of Gurpreet Singh

6 #2

Exhibit 2 -- Request for Payment of Administrative Claim

#6

(#6) Request for Judicial Notice re #5 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTimothy W. Hoffman, Timothy W. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- "Main Case" Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Request for Payment of Administrative Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Declaration of Gurpreet Singh, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Declaration of John MacConaghy, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Declaration of Austin Wade, #6 Exhibit 6 -- 9/9/19 Transcript of Hearing, #7 Exhibit 7 -- 10/22/19 Transcript of Hearing, #8 Exhibit 8 -- Order for Examination, #9 Exhibit 9 -- Motion to Compel Turnover, #10 Exhibit 10 -- SSH Opposition to Motion to Compel Turnover, #11 Exhibit 11-- Order to Compel Turnover, #12 Exhibit 12 -- Application for OSC re Contempt, #13 Exhibit 13-- Declaration in Support thereof, #14 Exhibit 14-- OSC re Contempt, #15 Exhibit 15-- Withdrawal of OSC, #16 Exhibit 16 -- SSH Notice of Appearance, #17 Exhibit 17 -- Palm Drive Healthcare District Chapter 9 Plan, #18 Exhibit 18-- Palm Drive Healthcare District Disclosure Statment, #19 Exhibit 19 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #20 Exhibit 20 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #21 Exhibit 21 -- Order Confirming Palm Drive Plan, #22 Exhibit 22 -- "Adversary Proceeding" Docket Sheet, #23 Exhibit 23 -- Complaint -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #24 Exhibit 24 -- Answer and Counterclaim -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #25 Exhibit 25 -- Answer to Counterclaim)(Related document(s) #5 ) (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/19/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Motion of Defendants and Counterclaimants for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND PERMITTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/19. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Reply in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Errata to #6 Plaintiff's Request to Take Judicial Notice filed by Timothy W. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 - SSH Exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement)(Related document(s) #6 ) (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Judicial Notice re #5 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTimothy W. Hoffman, Timothy W. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- "Main Case" Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Request for Payment of Administrative Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Declaration of Gurpreet Singh, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Declaration of John MacConaghy, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Declaration of Austin Wade, #6 Exhibit 6 -- 9/9/19 Transcript of Hearing, #7 Exhibit 7 -- 10/22/19 Transcript of Hearing, #8 Exhibit 8 -- Order for Examination, #9 Exhibit 9 -- Motion to Compel Turnover, #10 Exhibit 10 -- SSH Opposition to Motion to Compel Turnover, #11 Exhibit 11-- Order to Compel Turnover, #12 Exhibit 12 -- Application for OSC re Contempt, #13 Exhibit 13-- Declaration in Support thereof, #14 Exhibit 14-- OSC re Contempt, #15 Exhibit 15-- Withdrawal of OSC, #16 Exhibit 16 -- SSH Notice of Appearance, #17 Exhibit 17 -- Palm Drive Healthcare District Chapter 9 Plan, #18 Exhibit 18-- Palm Drive Healthcare District Disclosure Statment, #19 Exhibit 19 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #20 Exhibit 20 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #21 Exhibit 21 -- Order Confirming Palm Drive Plan, #22 Exhibit 22 -- "Adversary Proceeding" Docket Sheet, #23 Exhibit 23 -- Complaint -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #24 Exhibit 24 -- Answer and Counterclaim -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #25 Exhibit 25 -- Answer to Counterclaim)(Related document(s) #5 ) (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/19/2019) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #3 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Timothy W. Hoffman, Timothy W. Hoffman. (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON #3 MOTION OF DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE: Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Motion of Defendants and Counterclaimants for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-BK-10665-RLE; AP 19-01030. Filed by Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, American Advanced Management Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Docket Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less