This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2020 at 10:53:50 (UTC).

In re: Smitty's/Cam2 303 Tractor Hydraulic Fluid Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 In re Smitty's/Cam2 303 Tractor Hydraulic Fluid Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-MD-02936

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terry Blackmore

Clinton Curry

Ron Nash

Jason Klingenberg

Randy Vilela

William James

Tracy Sullivan

Brian Hayes

Rusty Shaw

Jay Simpson

Adam Sevy

Jacob Mabie

Anthony Shaw

Defendants

Smitty's Supply, Inc.

CAM2 International L.L.C.

Atwood Home Supply, Inc.

Atwood Distributing, LP

Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC Kansas, 2:19-cv-02257 doing business as Orscheln Farm & Home

Rural King

Not Classified By Court

Mabie Trucking, Inc.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan Turner White

Attorney at WHITE, GRAHAM, BUCKLEY & CARR, LLC

19049 East Valley View Parkway, Ste. C

Independence, MO 64055

Paul D. Lundberg

600 Fourth St., Suite 906

Sioux City, IA 51101

Thomas V Bender

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Dirk L. Hubbard

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

Gene P. Graham

Attorney at White Graham et al

19049 E Valley View Pkwy, Ste C

Independence, MO 64055

Patricia Campbell

Attorney at Langdon & Emison

911 Main Street, P.O. Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

Athena M. Dickson

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson, PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

William L Carr

Attorney at White, Graham, Buckley & Carr

19049 E Valley View Parkway, Suite C

Independence, MO 64055

Mark P. Bryant

Attorney at Bryant Law Center, PSC

601 Washington Street

Paducah, KY 42003

Defendant Attorneys

Jacqueline Annette Cook

Attorney at Franke, Schultz & Mullen - KCMO

8900 Ward Parkway

Kansas City, MO 64114

Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro

Attorney at Franke, Schultz & Mullen - KCMO

8900 Ward Parkway

Kansas City, MO 64114

Justin Edward Vandenbout

Attorney at Chamberlain Hrdlicka et al

1200 Smith St, 14Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Jessica L. Klander

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ryan T. Polczynski

Attorney at Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC

300 Broadway Street, P.O. Box 995

Paducah, KY 42002-0995

Michael A. Klutho

Attorney at Bassford Remele, PA

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joseph R. Swift

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Other Attorneys

Samuel M. Ward

Attorney at Barrack Rodos & Bacine

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Stephen Richard Basser

Attorney at Barrack Rodos & Bacine

600 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Christopher D. Jennings

610 President Clinton Avenue, Suite 300

Little Rock, AR 72201

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#45

44 #6

Exhibit 6

44 #5

Exhibit 5

44 #4

Exhibit 4

44 #3

Exhibit 3

44 #2

Exhibit 2

44 #1

Exhibit 1

#44

#43

#41

#30

#28

#9

#8

#6

#5

#3

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #28 MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Hubbard, Dirk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #30 MOTION for protective order Relating to Deposition of Greg Sandfort filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendant Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) DESIGNATION Amended Designation of Mediator by Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg(Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02684), Jason Klingenberg(Iowa Northern, 5:19-cv-04052), Jacob Mabie, Mabie Trucking, Inc., Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela(Missouri Western, 3:19-cv-05089), Randy Vilela(Kansas, 2:19-cv-02257), Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes. (White, Bryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#42) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Parties (Doc. 41) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before July 31, 2020. Signed on 7/24/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply regarding CAC MDL Model and Direct Filing filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hubbard, Dirk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER regarding standalone docketing. Signed on 7/24/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (63 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 64 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 28 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 93 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 89 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 174 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 58 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 75 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 55 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB) MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, Cross Claimant Rural King, Cross Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Joint MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols. Signed on 7/22/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Joint MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (30 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 77 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 176 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 57 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 91 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 95 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 65 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 66 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 60 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB) MOTION for protective order filed by Bryan White on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg, Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes, George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Sean Buford, Jason Klingenberg. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla))(White, Bryan) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) by Buford Case Plaintiffs against CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Sean Buford.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) by Wurth Case Plaintiffs against CAM2 International L.L.C., Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Tim Sullivan, Kirk Egner, Dwayne Wurth, Tracy Sullivan.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Matthew R Pickelman for Tractor Supply Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed on 6/19/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER. Signed on 6/19/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/18/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Time in court: 9:30 am to 9:50 am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow Matthew Pickelman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6903637) filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Tractor Supply Company. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 6/18/2020 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Conference call information emailed to counsel. (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 20-md-2936 has been opened and assigned to Judge Stephen R. Bough. See Docket for further entries. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 2936. The case is assigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC Kansas, 2:19-cv-02257 doing business as Orscheln Farm & Home is a litigant

Latest cases where Mabie Trucking, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAM2 International L.L.C. is a litigant