This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 12:10:23 (UTC).

In Re: Sierra International LLC

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 In Re Sierra International LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna Phillips Currault and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-MC-01730

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sierra International LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ashley E. Bane

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker, LLP (New Orleans)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael A Harowski

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker, LLP (New Orleans)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Movant Sierra International LLC's #2 Motion to Quash Subpoena is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/2/2020. (sa) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

2 #1

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Sierra International LLC. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Bane, Ashley) Modified text, referred motion, added submission date on 6/16/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Proposed Order

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous Case Petition of Motion to Quash Subpoena (Filing fee $47 receipt number ALAEDC-8355666) filed by Sierra International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ashley E. Bane added to party Sierra International LLC(pty:mov).(Bane, Ashley) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Movant Sierra International LLC's #2 Motion to Quash Subpoena is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/2/2020. (sa) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Sierra International LLC. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Bane, Ashley) Modified text, referred motion, added submission date on 6/16/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous Case Petition of Motion to Quash Subpoena (Filing fee $47 receipt number ALAEDC-8355666) filed by Sierra International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ashley E. Bane added to party Sierra International LLC(pty:mov).(Bane, Ashley) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Serra International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley E. Bane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Harowski