This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 11:18:32 (UTC).

In Re: Seattle Spinco Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 In Re Seattle Spinco Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00410

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Micro Focus LLC

Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC

Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd.

Micro Focus (US) Inc.

Entco Government Software LLC

Entco Interactive (Israel) Ltd.

Seattle Spinco Inc.

EntIT Software LLC

Defendant

Adobe, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Richard Silverstein

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

L. Rex Sears

Defendant Attorneys

Amisha K. Manek

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Victoria Q. Smith

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A-J

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Letter to clerk regarding sealed documents

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference is set for 3/3/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Pursuant to Judge Noreika's discovery dispute procedures, the pending motion to compel shall be converted to a letter brief of no more than three (3) pages and shall be filed no later than 2/24/2021. Adobe's responsive letter of no more than five (5) pages, including its arguments for its anticipated motion to quash, shall be filed no later than 2/25/2021. On or before 2/26/2021, Plaintiff may file a responsive letter of no more than two (2) pages regarding the motion to quash. Counsel shall provide dial-in credentials for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/13/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Valentine filed by Adobe, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/12/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. Valentine - filed by Adobe, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Victoria Q. Smith for Adobe, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Amisha K. Manek for Adobe, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victoria Q. Smith and Amisha K. Manek filed by Adobe, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Victoria Q. Smith and Amisha K. Manek - filed by Adobe, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Adobe, Inc. to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Subpoenas to through and including January 11, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/5/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney L. Rex Sears for Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seattle Spinco Inc., Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus (US) Inc.. (Silverstein, Alan) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (sam) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #1 MOTION to Seal filed by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Seattle Spinco Inc., Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC. Micro Focus shall meet and confer with Adobe, Inc. and file a public version of the above documents within seven (7) days of this order. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/21/2020. (fms) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRemark: Exit to Duty Judge CFC. (sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Micro Focus International Plc. for Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. filed by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. (sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [SEALED] DECLARATION OF BRADLEY COBURN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS - by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS - filed by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2021. (sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS - filed by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Letter to clerk regarding sealed documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fee Paid Rec # 034782)(sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) [SEALED] PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIS MOTION AND THEIR BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER SEAL - filed by Micro Focus (US) Inc., Micro Focus Government Solutions LLC, Micro Focus Interactive Israel Ltd., Micro Focus LLC, Seattle Spinco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EntIT Software LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADOBE INC is a litigant