This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 10:10:30 (UTC).

In Re: Scorpion Fitness Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 In Re Scorpion Fitness Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06953

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Appellant

John Shams

New York, NY 10016

In Re and Debtor

Scorpion Fitness Inc.

Appellee

Salvatore LaMonica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Gary F. Herbst

Attorney at Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

3305 Jerusalem Ave., Ste. 201

Wantagh, NY 11793

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Memo Endorsement, to John Shams at 325 Fifth Avenue, #41E, New York, NY 10016. (dsh) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. ENDORSEMENT: For the reason(s) set forth above, the appeal is deemed abandoned, and IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is hereby DISMISSED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/2/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPELLATE'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL. Document filed by John Shams.(sc) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (wb) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Michael E. Wiles dated August 6, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-B-11231 (MEW). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by John Shams.(bkar) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scorpion Fitness Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary F. Herbst