This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2020 at 14:45:51 (UTC).

In Re: Samson Resources Corp.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 In Re Samson Resources Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

Diane S. Jones

Waldorf, MD 20602

Appellee and Debtor

Samson Resources Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Michael De Lillo

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert Charles Maddox

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#5

(#5) SO ORDERED, re #4 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/13/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/23/20. (cak) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert C. Maddox, Esq. regarding Miscellaneous Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maddox, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 5/26/2020 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 15-11934. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Diane S. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER: The Court takes note that a proposed form of order was not filed with the letter at D.I. #3 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/13/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SO ORDERED, re #4 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/13/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/23/20. (cak) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Robert C. Maddox, Esq. regarding Miscellaneous Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maddox, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 5/26/2020 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 15-11934. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Diane S. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less