This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:26:30 (UTC).

In Re: Royal Street Bistro, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 In Re Royal Street Bistro, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02285

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Royal Street Bistro, LLC

Picture Pro, LLC

Susan Hoffman

Appellees

Royal Alice Properties, LLC

AMAG, Inc.

Trustees

Dwayne M Murray

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Albert Joseph Derbes, IV

Attorney at Derbes Law Firm, LLC

3027 Ridgelake Dr.

Metairie, LA 70002

Frederick L. Bunol

Attorney at Derbes Law Firm, LLC

3027 Ridgelake Dr.

Metairie, LA 70002

Carlos Alberto Zelaya, II

Attorney at Mumphrey Zelaya Law Firm

2118 Pakenham Drive

Chalmette, LA 70043

Appellee Attorneys

Leo David Congeni

Attorney at Congeni Law Firm, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2750

New Orleans, LA 70130

John F. Kurtz, Jr

Attorney at Kurtz Law PLLC

910 W Main Street, Suite 364

Boise, ID 83702

Trustee Attorneys

Louis M. Phillips

One American Place, 301 Main Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Erin K. Arnold

Attorney at Kelly Hart Pitre

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1812

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dwayne M. Murray

4970 Bluebonnet Blvd, Suite B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Amanda Burnette George

Attorney at U. S. Trustee

400 Poydras St., Suite 2110, Texaco Center

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERED that the referenced matters (21-cv-02285-SSV-DMD and 22-cv-00144-SSV-DMD) are hereby consolidated. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/7/2022. (jls) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER AND REASONS: The Court DENIES appellants' #4 motion for a stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/3/2022. (pp) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

8 #9

PLEAD - Doc 623 - Transcript on 01.12.22

8 #8

PLEAD - Doc 621 - Order Setting Hearing on Emergency Motion

4 #9

Appendix_Part 6

4 #8

Appendix_Part 5

4 #7

Appendix_Part 4

4 #6

Appendix_Part 3

4 #5

Appendix_Part 2

4 #4

Appendix_Part 1

4 #3

Declaration of Susan Hoffman

4 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Declaration of Susan Hoffman, #4 Appendix_Part 1, #5 Appendix_Part 2, #6 Appendix_Part 3, #7 Appendix_Part 4, #8 Appendix_Part 5, #9 Appendix_Part 6)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDERED that the referenced matters (21-cv-02285-SSV-DMD and 22-cv-00144-SSV-DMD) are hereby consolidated. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/7/2022. (jls) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER AND REASONS: The Court DENIES appellants' #4 motion for a stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/3/2022. (pp) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. (lw) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Oppositon to Motion filed by Dwayne M Murray re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal . (Attachments: #1 Index of Relevant Pleadings, #2 PLEAD - Doc 518 - Transcript on 09.27.21, #3 PLEAD - Doc 546 - Ex Parte Motion To Strike, #4 PLEAD - Doc 550 - Memorandum of Law, #5 PLEAD - Doc 555 - Reply Memorandum, #6 PLEAD - Doc 616 - Order Denying Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, #7 PLEAD - Doc 620 - Emergency Motion For Order Requiring Tenants To Give Trustee Access To Property, #8 PLEAD - Doc 621 - Order Setting Hearing on Emergency Motion, #9 PLEAD - Doc 623 - Transcript on 01.12.22, #10 PLEAD - Doc 624 - Objection, #11 PLEAD - 57-6 - Declaration of Susan Hoffman)(Phillips, Louis) Modified text on 1/25/2022 (lw). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Expedite Submission of Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement of Orders. The submission date on the #4 Emergency Motion For Stay of Orders shall be January 26, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. All oppositions to the Motion to Stay shall be filed on or before January 24, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Movants shall have until January 26, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. to file a Reply to any Opposition to the Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/20/2022.(mm) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 MOTION to Expedite Submission of Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement of Orders, #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal. Document lists counsel of record, David Serio, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Please either file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel or remove the counsel from the signature block. (lw) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal. This is a duplicate filing of document 4 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (lw) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Declaration of Susan Hoffman, #4 Appendix_Part 1, #5 Appendix_Part 2, #6 Appendix_Part 3, #7 Appendix_Part 4, #8 Appendix_Part 5, #9 Appendix_Part 6)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Submission of Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement of Orders by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bunol, Frederick) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DUPLICATE: Emergency MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered in Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal by Susan Hoffman, Picture Pro, LLC, Royal Street Bistro, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Susan Hoffman, #3 Notice of Submission)(Bunol, Frederick) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (lw). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Meredith S. Grabill. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Royal Street Bistro, LLC, Picture Pro, LLC, Susan Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 USBS Opinion and Order, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Letter)(lw) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAG, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dwayne M. Murray

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Burnette George(Designation Retained)