This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2020 at 11:16:13 (UTC).

In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo was filed as a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-MC-80122

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Wesley Samples

Attorney at The United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application for Order Pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C. section 1782, In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/12/2020. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

1 #4

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #2

Declaration

1 #1

Memorandum

#1

(#1) Application In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application for Order Pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C. section 1782, In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/12/2020. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application In Re Request for International Judicial Assistance From the Seoul Central District Court of Seoul, Republic of Korea in the Matter of Seon Joo Yeo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Wesley Samples