This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

In Re: Quorum Health Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 In Re Quorum Health Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01601

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellant

Rajeev Varma

Palos Heights, IL 60463

Debtor and Appellee

Quorum Health Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

David R. Hurst

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

4Th Floor, 1007 North Orange Street, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 10/01/2021 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 20-10766 (Adv. Proc. No. 20-51053 (BLS)). Fee Status not Paid.- filed by Rajeev Varma. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on Appeal)(mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

1 #1

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #2

Order on Appeal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER regarding Appellant's contact with the Court by telephone and by mail. Appellant's request to make filings by email and/or to have access to CM/ECF is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01601-LPS, 1:21-cv-01604-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER, Appellant shall pay the $298 filing fee or submit a complete IFP long form application. Failure to submit items within 30 days may result in dismissal of this appeal without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/20/2021. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/2021. (srs) Modified on 11/19/2021 (srs). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER regarding Appellant's contact with the Court by telephone and by mail. Appellant's request to make filings by email and/or to have access to CM/ECF is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/22. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01601-LPS, 1:21-cv-01604-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2021
  • DocketRemark: BK Notice of Appeal Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number A10584136, amount $ 298.00 as of 12/11/2021. (cna, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER, Appellant shall pay the $298 filing fee or submit a complete IFP long form application. Failure to submit items within 30 days may result in dismissal of this appeal without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/20/2021. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/2021. (srs) Modified on 11/19/2021 (srs). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01601-UNA, 1:21-cv-01602-UNA, 1:21-cv-01603-UNA, 1:21-cv-01604-UNA(nms) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketRemark : Copy of docket sheet was mailed to Pro Se filer. (mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 10/01/2021 by Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 20-10766 (Adv. Proc. No. 20-51053 (BLS)). Fee Status not Paid.- filed by Rajeev Varma. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on Appeal)(mal) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quorum Health Corporation is a litigant