This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2021 at 17:33:10 (UTC).

In re: PWR Invest, LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 In re PWR Invest, LP was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02255

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellants

Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP

Oklahoma Merge, LP

Oklahoma River Basin, LP

PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.

PWR Invest, LP

Debtor

PWR INVEST, LP, et al.,

Appellees

Chambers Energy Management, LP

Office of the United States Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

David M. Powlen

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin Grant Collins

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Michael R. Lastowski

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Jarret P. Hitchings

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Linda Richenderfer

Attorney at Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers

919 Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/20. (cak) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER Dismissing Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2020. (nms) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline and to Modify Briefing Schedule - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 2/21/2020 (nms). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Kathman - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerrit M. Pronske - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

No Description Available

#6

SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2019. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2019. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lastowski on behalf of Chambers Energy Management, LP (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #2 has been replaced with a corrected version. (rwc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Exhibit Order on Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 11/26/2019 by Honorable John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 19-11164. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(apk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Dismissing Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2020. (nms) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #13 Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline and to Modify Briefing Schedule (*Reset Deadlines: Appellant's Opening Brief due by 3/25/2020, Appellee's Brief due by 4/24/2020, Appellant's Reply Brief due by 5/8/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2020. (nms) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline and to Modify Briefing Schedule - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 2/21/2020 (nms). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SO ORDERED Granting (as modified) #11 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Appellant Brief due by 2/24/2020, Appellee Brief due by 3/16/2020, Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2020. (nms) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #2 has been replaced with a corrected version. (rwc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/20. (cak) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerrit M. Pronske, filed by Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc., Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP, and #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Kathman, filed by Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc., Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2020. (nms) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason P. Kathman - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerrit M. Pronske - filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, PWR Invest, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss, filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2019. (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Reiss - filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. (Hitchings, Jarret) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Goldberg - filed by Chambers Energy Management, LP. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lastowski on behalf of Chambers Energy Management, LP (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, January 9, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/12/19. (cak) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (apk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/31/2020) (rwc). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (apk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (apk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 11/26/2019 by Honorable John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 19-11164. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Oklahoma Merge Midstream, LP, PWR Invest, LP, Oklahoma River Basin, LP, Oklahoma Merge, LP, PWR Oil & Gas General Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(apk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda Richenderfer